EP1195561 - Cascade with once-through heat exchangers for sanitary- or fresh water heating [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.04.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states varmeco GmbH & Co. KG Apfeltranger Strasse 16 87600 Kaufbeuren / DE | [2007/41] |
Former [2007/22] | For all designated states SANDLER ENERGIETECHNIK GMBH & CO KG Apfeltranger Str. 16 87600 Kaufbeuren / DE | ||
Former [2002/15] | For all designated states SANDLER ENERGIETECHNIK GMBH & CO KG Apfeltranger Str. 16 87600 Kaufbeuren / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Reckziegel, Martin Eichenstrasse 19 87648 Aitrang / DE | 02 /
Sandler, Martin Ölmühlhang 17 87600 Kaufbeuren / DE | [2002/15] | Representative(s) | Leonhard, Frank Reimund, et al Leonhard & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 10 09 62 80083 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/15] | Leonhard, Frank Reimund, Dipl.-Ing., et al Leonhard - Olgemöller - Fricke Patentanwälte Postfach 10 09 57 80083 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01123674.2 | 02.10.2001 | [2002/15] | Priority number, date | DE2000148912 | 03.10.2000 Original published format: DE 10048912 | [2002/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1195561 | Date: | 10.04.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1195561 | Date: | 02.07.2003 | [2003/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1195561 | Date: | 30.05.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.05.2003 | Classification | IPC: | F24D17/00, F24D19/10 | [2002/15] | CPC: |
F24D19/1051 (EP,US);
F24D17/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/15] | Title | German: | Kaskade mit Durchlauf-Wärmetauschern zur Brauchwasser- oder Frischwassererwärmung | [2002/15] | English: | Cascade with once-through heat exchangers for sanitary- or fresh water heating | [2002/15] | French: | Cascade avec des échangeurs de chaleur instantanés pour l'eau fraiche ou sanitaire | [2007/03] |
Former [2002/15] | Cascade avec des echangeurs de chaleur instantanés pour l'eau fraiche ou sanitaire | Examination procedure | 02.12.2003 | Examination requested [2004/05] | 12.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.07.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 02.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.12.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.04.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 10.04.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.03.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/19] | Request for further processing for: | 02.10.2006 | Request for further processing filed | 06.10.2006 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 18.10.2006 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 30.05.2007 | DK | 30.05.2007 | FI | 30.05.2007 | GB | 30.05.2007 | IE | 30.05.2007 | IT | 30.05.2007 | NL | 30.05.2007 | TR | 30.05.2007 | SE | 30.08.2007 | GR | 31.08.2007 | ES | 10.09.2007 | LU | 02.10.2007 | PT | 30.10.2007 | BE | 31.10.2007 | MC | 31.10.2007 | FR | 25.01.2008 | [2009/42] |
Former [2009/37] | CY | 30.05.2007 | |
DK | 30.05.2007 | ||
FI | 30.05.2007 | ||
GB | 30.05.2007 | ||
IE | 30.05.2007 | ||
IT | 30.05.2007 | ||
NL | 30.05.2007 | ||
SE | 30.08.2007 | ||
GR | 31.08.2007 | ||
ES | 10.09.2007 | ||
LU | 02.10.2007 | ||
PT | 30.10.2007 | ||
BE | 31.10.2007 | ||
MC | 31.10.2007 | ||
FR | 25.01.2008 | ||
Former [2009/33] | CY | 30.05.2007 | |
DK | 30.05.2007 | ||
FI | 30.05.2007 | ||
GB | 30.05.2007 | ||
IE | 30.05.2007 | ||
IT | 30.05.2007 | ||
NL | 30.05.2007 | ||
SE | 30.08.2007 | ||
GR | 31.08.2007 | ||
ES | 10.09.2007 | ||
PT | 30.10.2007 | ||
BE | 31.10.2007 | ||
MC | 31.10.2007 | ||
FR | 25.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/43] | DK | 30.05.2007 | |
FI | 30.05.2007 | ||
GB | 30.05.2007 | ||
IE | 30.05.2007 | ||
IT | 30.05.2007 | ||
NL | 30.05.2007 | ||
SE | 30.08.2007 | ||
GR | 31.08.2007 | ||
ES | 10.09.2007 | ||
PT | 30.10.2007 | ||
BE | 31.10.2007 | ||
MC | 31.10.2007 | ||
FR | 25.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/32] | DK | 30.05.2007 | |
FI | 30.05.2007 | ||
GB | 30.05.2007 | ||
IE | 30.05.2007 | ||
IT | 30.05.2007 | ||
NL | 30.05.2007 | ||
SE | 30.08.2007 | ||
GR | 31.08.2007 | ||
ES | 10.09.2007 | ||
PT | 30.10.2007 | ||
MC | 31.10.2007 | ||
FR | 25.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/26] | DK | 30.05.2007 | |
FI | 30.05.2007 | ||
GB | 30.05.2007 | ||
IE | 30.05.2007 | ||
IT | 30.05.2007 | ||
NL | 30.05.2007 | ||
SE | 30.08.2007 | ||
GR | 31.08.2007 | ||
ES | 10.09.2007 | ||
PT | 30.10.2007 | ||
MC | 31.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/23] | DK | 30.05.2007 | |
FI | 30.05.2007 | ||
GB | 30.05.2007 | ||
IE | 30.05.2007 | ||
IT | 30.05.2007 | ||
NL | 30.05.2007 | ||
SE | 30.08.2007 | ||
GR | 31.08.2007 | ||
ES | 10.09.2007 | ||
PT | 30.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/19] | DK | 30.05.2007 | |
FI | 30.05.2007 | ||
GB | 30.05.2007 | ||
IE | 30.05.2007 | ||
NL | 30.05.2007 | ||
SE | 30.08.2007 | ||
GR | 31.08.2007 | ||
ES | 10.09.2007 | ||
PT | 30.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/10] | DK | 30.05.2007 | |
FI | 30.05.2007 | ||
IE | 30.05.2007 | ||
NL | 30.05.2007 | ||
SE | 30.08.2007 | ||
ES | 10.09.2007 | ||
PT | 30.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | DK | 30.05.2007 | |
FI | 30.05.2007 | ||
NL | 30.05.2007 | ||
SE | 30.08.2007 | ||
ES | 10.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | DK | 30.05.2007 | |
FI | 30.05.2007 | ||
SE | 30.08.2007 | ||
ES | 10.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/48] | FI | 30.05.2007 | |
SE | 30.08.2007 | ||
ES | 10.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/47] | ES | 10.09.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JPS63273757 ; | [XY]FR2531189 (COLLARD TROLART [FR]) [X] 20,22,26 * page 4, line 24 - page 8, line 3; figure 1 * [Y] 1,3,5-10; | [X]DE3809893 (STEAG FERNWAERME [DE]) [X] 26 * abstract * | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890221), vol. 013, no. 076, Database accession no. (M - 800), & JP63273757 A 19881110 (NORITSU CO LTD) [X] 20,22 * abstract * [Y] 1,3,5-10 | by applicant | DE4035115 |