EP1300816 - Method and system to detect fires in enclosed spaces [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.05.2004 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.07.2004 [2004/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VIDAIR Aktiengesellschaft An der Eickesmühle 22 41238 Mönchengladbach / DE | [2003/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hecker, Cornelius An der Lohmühle 8 41189 Mönchengladbach / DE | 02 /
Opitz, Daniel Lauerstrasse 726 41812 Erkelenz / DE | [2003/15] | Representative(s) | Paul, Dieter-Alfred Paul & Albrecht Patentanwälte PartG mbB Stresemannallee 4b 41460 Neuss / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/15] | Paul, Dieter-Alfred, Dipl.-Ing. Paul & Albrecht, Patentanwaltssozietät, Hellersbergstrasse 18 41460 Neuss / DE | Application number, filing date | 01123718.7 | 04.10.2001 | [2003/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1300816 | Date: | 09.04.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.03.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G08B17/103 | [2003/15] | CPC: |
G08B17/125 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | [2004/01] |
Former [2003/15] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und System zur Erkennung von Bränden in Räumen | [2003/15] | English: | Method and system to detect fires in enclosed spaces | [2003/15] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de détection des incendies dans les enceintes fermées | [2003/15] | Examination procedure | 10.10.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/29] | 05.02.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2004/29] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 19.11.2003 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 19.11.2003 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.11.2003 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 19.11.2003 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 19.11.2003 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.11.2003 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 19.11.2003 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 19.11.2003 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 19.11.2003 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 19.11.2003 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 19.11.2003 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 19.11.2003 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.11.2003 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 19.11.2003 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 19.11.2003 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 19.11.2003 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 19.11.2003 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 19.11.2003 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.11.2003 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 19.11.2003 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2003 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4614968 (RATTMAN WILLIAM J [US], et al) [Y] 15* abstract *; | [Y]US5049756 (BROWN DE COLSTOUN FRANCOIS [US], et al) [Y] 7,10,12 * column 1 - column 3; figure 4 *; | [X]EP0472039 (NOHMI BOSAI LTD [JP]) [X] 1,4,13,17,19 * column 7, line 20 - column 8, line 34; figures 1,7,8 * * abstract *; | [XY]EP0978718 (DEUTSCH ZENTR LUFT & RAUMFAHRT [DE]) [X] 1-3,5,6,8,9,11,13,14,16,20 * abstract * * page 3, line 24 - page 7, line 7 * [Y] 7,10,12,15 |