EP1300239 - Non-oriented polyproylene film [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.07.2003 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.08.2003 [2003/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Borealis Technology Oy P.O. Box 330 06201 Porvoo / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2003/15] | For all designated states Borealis Technology OY P.O. Box 330 06201 Porvoo / FI | Representative(s) | VA TECH Patente GmbH & Co Wolfgang-Pauli-Strasse 2 4020 Linz / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2003/15] | VA TECH Patente GmbH & Co Stahlstrasse 21 a 4020 Linz / AT | Application number, filing date | 01123752.6 | 04.10.2001 | [2003/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1300239 | Date: | 09.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.04.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B32B27/32, C08J5/18, B65D65/40, // C08L23:10 | [2003/15] | CPC: |
C08J5/18 (EP);
C08J2323/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/15] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Nicht-orientierter Polypropylenfilm | [2003/15] | English: | Non-oriented polyproylene film | [2003/15] | French: | Film de polypropylène non-orienté | [2003/15] | Examination procedure | 05.02.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/34] | 18.03.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [2003/34] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH02301435 ; | [A]JPH07330922 ; | [A]EP0015472 (HOECHST AG [DE]) [A] 1* claims 1,2,6,10 *; | [A]EP0465912 (MOPLEFAN SPA [IT]) [A] 1 * claims 1,8,9 *; | [A]DE4128820 (HOECHST AG [DE]) [A] 1 * claims 1,11 *; | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1991, no. 05, Database accession no. 1991-032458, XP002194820 & JPH02301435 A 19901213 (TORAY IND INC) [X] 1,3,8-10,12-14 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1996, no. 08, Database accession no. 1996-074998, XP002194821 & JPH07330922 A 19951219 (TORAY IND INC) [A] 1 * abstract * |