EP1217414 - Ceramic substrate for photonic switching system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 24.01.2004 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 15.07.2009 [2009/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Agilent Technologies, Inc. (A Delaware Corporation) 395 Page Mill Road Palo Alto CA 94303 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/26] | For all designated states Agilent Technologies, Inc. (a Delaware corporation) 395 Page Mill Road Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Myer, Paul Charles 1499 Dentwood Drive San Jose, CA 95118 / US | 02 /
Trott, Gary 1215 Parrott Drive San Mateo, CA 94402 / US | [2002/26] | Representative(s) | Schoppe, Fritz Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler Patentanwälte Postfach 246 82043 Pullach bei München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/29] | Schoppe, Fritz Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler Patentanwälte Postfach 246 82043 Pullach bei München / DE | ||
Former [2002/26] | Schoppe, Fritz, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler, Postfach 71 08 67 81458 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01123863.1 | 05.10.2001 | [2002/26] | Priority number, date | US20000741617 | 18.12.2000 Original published format: US 741617 | [2002/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1217414 | Date: | 26.06.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1217414 | Date: | 28.01.2004 | [2004/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G02B26/02 | [2002/26] | CPC: |
G02B26/004 (EP,US);
G02B6/3538 (EP,US);
G02B6/3522 (EP,US);
G02B6/3546 (EP,US);
G02B6/3576 (EP,US);
G02B6/3582 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/26] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Keramiksubstrat für ein photonisches Schaltsystem | [2002/26] | English: | Ceramic substrate for photonic switching system | [2002/26] | French: | Substrat en céramique pour un système photonique de commutation | [2002/26] | Examination procedure | 19.01.2004 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2004/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4076955 (GATES JR LOUIS E) [A] 1,5,6,10* column 3, line 41 - column 4, line 39; figures 2-5 *; | [A]EP0813088 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [A] 1,4,6,9 * column 6, lines 12-29; column 11, line 58 to column 13, line 22; figures 4,5 *; | [A]EP0938013 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [A] 1,6 * paragraphs [0012] , [0013] , [0023] - [0047]; figures 3,16 *; | [A]US6072924 (SATO MAKOTO [JP], et al) [A] 1,6 * paragraphs [0022] - [0025]; figures 3-6 *; | [AP]EP1130443 (AGILENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [AP] 1,4,6,9 * column 16, line 45 to column 17, line 17; column 21, line 20 to column 26, line 48; figures 4,7,8 * |