EP1303017 - Box for dry wall [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.09.2006 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.09.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.10.2006 [2006/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Adolf Würth GmbH & Co. KG Reinhold-Würth-Strasse 12-16 74653 Künzelsau / DE | [2003/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Reuther, Herbert Kapellenstrasse 32 74238 Gommersdorf / DE | 02 /
Humm, Siegfried Haldenstrasse13 74214 Schöntal-Westernhausen / DE | [2003/16] | Representative(s) | Schöndorf, Jürgen Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner Kronenstrasse 30 70174 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/16] | Schöndorf, Jürgen Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner, Kronenstrasse 30 70174 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 01124072.8 | 10.10.2001 | [2003/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1303017 | Date: | 16.04.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.03.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H02G3/12 | [2003/16] | CPC: |
H02G3/123 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/10] |
Former [2004/02] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2003/16] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Hohlwanddose | [2003/16] | English: | Box for dry wall | [2003/16] | French: | Boîte pour cloison sèche | [2003/16] | Examination procedure | 19.12.2003 | Examination requested [2004/10] | 03.05.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/43] | 07.06.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2006/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 24.11.2003 | AT   M01   Fee paid on   19.12.2003 | 24.11.2003 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   19.12.2003 | 24.11.2003 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   19.12.2003 | 24.11.2003 | CY   M01   Fee paid on   19.12.2003 | 24.11.2003 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   19.12.2003 | 24.11.2003 | DK   M01   Fee paid on   19.12.2003 | 24.11.2003 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   19.12.2003 | 24.11.2003 | FI   M01   Fee paid on   19.12.2003 | 24.11.2003 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   19.12.2003 | 24.11.2003 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   19.12.2003 | 24.11.2003 | GR   M01   Fee paid on   19.12.2003 | 24.11.2003 | IE   M01   Fee paid on   19.12.2003 | 24.11.2003 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   19.12.2003 | 24.11.2003 | LU   M01   Fee paid on   19.12.2003 | 24.11.2003 | MC   M01   Fee paid on   19.12.2003 | 24.11.2003 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   19.12.2003 | 24.11.2003 | PT   M01   Fee paid on   19.12.2003 | 24.11.2003 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   19.12.2003 | 24.11.2003 | TR   M01   Fee paid on   19.12.2003 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 24.11.2003 | M01   Fee paid on   19.12.2003 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2003 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   04.03.2004 | 31.10.2005 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE9311023U (EICHSFELDER TECHNIK EITECH GMB [DE]) |