EP1197621 - Locking arrangement for storage bin [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.11.2004 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.08.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 05.09.2007 [2007/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schwarz Verbindungs-Systeme GmbH Im Unteren Ried 7 75382 Althengstett / DE | [2002/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schwarz, Helmut Landhausstrasse 23 71263 Weil der Stadt / DE | [2002/16] | Representative(s) | Puschmann, Heinz H. Bardehle Puschmann Borchert Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Postfach 10 12 31 80086 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/24] | Puschmann, Heinz H., Dipl.-Ing.(FH) Puschmann & Borchert, Patentanwälte, European Patent Attorneys, Postfach 10 12 31 80086 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/16] | Blutke, Klaus Wilhelm, Dipl.-Ing. Schafgasse 1 71032 Böblingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 01124192.4 | 11.10.2001 | [2002/16] | Priority number, date | DE2000217674U | 14.10.2000 Original published format: DE 20017674 U | [2002/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1197621 | Date: | 17.04.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1197621 | Date: | 14.01.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.01.2002 | Classification | IPC: | E05C3/24 | [2002/16] | CPC: |
B64D11/003 (EP);
E05B5/00 (EP);
E05C3/16 (EP);
E05B41/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2003/02] |
Former [2002/16] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verriegelungsanordnung für ein Gepäckfach | [2002/16] | English: | Locking arrangement for storage bin | [2002/16] | French: | Dispositif de verrouillage pour coffre de rangement | [2002/16] | Examination procedure | 25.04.2002 | Examination requested [2002/27] | 05.07.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.11.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.07.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.09.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 23.09.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.10.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 14.01.2004 | [2007/36] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB246079 (BUDD EDWARD G MFG CO, et al) [A] 1 * page 2, line 43 - page 3, line 75; figures 1-6 *; | [X]US2311688 (CARL OLSON) [X] 1 * page 1, column 2, line 8 - page 2, column 2, line 4; figures 1-6 *; | [A]US5630630 (PRICE ROBERT J [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 2, line 37 - column 4, line 62; figures 1-7 *; | [DA]DE29808914U (SCHWARZ VERBINDUNGS SYS GMBH [DE]) [DA] 1,2,6,7* page 9, paragraph 2; figures 2A,8 * |