EP1199887 - Television program guiding apparatus and method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.07.2008 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.08.2008 [2008/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pioneer Corporation 4-1 Meguro 1-chome, Meguro-ku Tokyo-to / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/17] | For all designated states Pioneer Corporation 4-1 Meguro 1-chome, Meguro-ku Tokyo-to / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Inoue, Tatsu, Pioneer Corporation, Ohmori Works No. 15-5 Ohmorinishi 4-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo-to / JP | [2002/17] | Representative(s) | Klingseisen, Franz, et al Klingseisen, Rings & Partner Patentanwälte Bräuhausstrasse 2 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/31] | Klingseisen, Franz, et al Klingeisen & Partner Bräuhausstrasse 2 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/02] | Klingseisen, Franz, et al Klingseisen & Partner Postfach 10 15 61 80089 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/17] | Klingseisen, Franz, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte, Dr. F. Zumstein, Dipl.-Ing. F. Klingseisen, Postfach 10 15 61 80089 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01124258.3 | 16.10.2001 | [2002/17] | Priority number, date | JP20000317789 | 18.10.2000 Original published format: JP 2000317789 | [2002/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1199887 | Date: | 24.04.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1199887 | Date: | 04.08.2004 | [2004/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.06.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/445 | [2002/17] | CPC: |
H04H60/72 (EP,US);
H04H60/47 (EP,US);
H04N21/4221 (EP,US);
H04N21/4314 (EP,US);
H04N21/4532 (EP,US);
H04N21/47 (EP,US);
H04N21/4728 (EP,US);
H04N21/4755 (EP,US);
H04N21/4821 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/17] |
Former [2002/17] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Fernsehprogrammführung | [2002/17] | English: | Television program guiding apparatus and method | [2002/17] | French: | Dispositif et procédé de guide de programmes de télévision | [2002/17] | Examination procedure | 04.08.2004 | Examination requested [2004/41] | 01.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.06.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.07.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.02.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.10.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.02.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/34] | 27.03.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2008/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2007 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO0030350 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]) [X] 1,10-13 * page 4, line 27 - line 35 * * page 5 - page 6 * * page 7, line 17 - line 19 * * figure 2 * [Y] 2-4; | [Y]US5793438 (BEDARD KAREN [US]) [Y] 2-4 * column 4 - column 5 * * figures 3c,5,6 *; | [A]WO9856176 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-4,10-13 * the whole document * |