EP1176234 - Supported catalysts, methods of making the same and methods of using the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2002/05] | Catalyst supports, supported catalysts, methods of making the same and methods of using the same | ||
[2005/10] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.09.2006 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2007 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: IT | published on 07.11.2007 [2007/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HYPERION CATALYSIS INTERNATIONAL, INC. 128 Spring Street Lexington, MA 02173 / US | [2002/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Moy, David 18119 Coachmans Road Germantown, MD 20874 / US | 02 /
Hoch, Robert R.R.1, Box 422 Hensonville, NY 12439 / US | [2002/20] |
Former [2002/05] | 01 /
Moy, David 21 Edward Drive Winchester, MA 01890 / US | ||
02 /
Hoch, Robert R.R.1, Box 422 Hensonville, NY 12439 / US | Representative(s) | Colmer, Stephen Gary, et al Mathys & Squire 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/05] | Colmer, Stephen Gary, et al Mathys & Squire 100 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8AL / GB | Application number, filing date | 01124301.1 | 12.05.1993 | [2002/05] | Priority number, date | US19920887314 | 22.05.1992 Original published format: US 887314 | [2002/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1176234 | Date: | 30.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/05] | Type: | A9 Corrected patent application | No.: | EP1176234 | Date: | 12.06.2002 | [2002/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1176234 | Date: | 06.11.2002 | [2002/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1176234 | Date: | 23.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.09.2002 | Classification | IPC: | D01F11/12, B01J21/18, B01J35/06, C01C1/04 | [2002/05] | CPC: |
B01J31/1616 (EP);
B01J21/18 (EP,KR);
B01J23/42 (EP);
B01J23/44 (EP);
B01J23/745 (EP);
B01J23/78 (EP);
B01J23/88 (EP);
B01J23/8946 (EP);
B01J31/20 (EP);
B01J31/2404 (EP);
B01J35/58 (EP);
C01C1/0411 (EP);
B01J2231/34 (EP);
B01J2531/62 (EP);
B01J2531/822 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/05] | Title | German: | Trägerkatalysatoren, Methoden zu deren Herstellung und Methoden zu deren Verwendung | [2005/10] | English: | Supported catalysts, methods of making the same and methods of using the same | [2005/10] | French: | Catalyseurs supportés, procédés de fabrication et d'utilisation | [2005/10] |
Former [2002/05] | Katalysatorträger, Trägerkatalysatoren, Methoden zu deren Herstellung und Methoden zu deren Verwendung | ||
Former [2002/05] | Catalyst supports, supported catalysts, methods of making the same and methods of using the same | ||
Former [2002/05] | Supports de catalyseurs, catalyseurs supportés, procédés de fabrication et d'utilisation | Examination procedure | 06.05.2003 | Examination requested [2003/28] | 16.10.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 17.06.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.06.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.01.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.08.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 23.08.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP93913831.9 / EP0641254 | Opposition(s) | 24.08.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 19.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 21.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 01.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 25.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 21.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2003 | 11   M06   Fee paid on   01.12.2003 | 31.05.2004 | 12   M06   Fee paid on   25.10.2004 | 31.05.2005 | 13   M06   Fee paid on   21.09.2005 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.11.2005 | DK | 23.02.2006 | GR | 23.02.2006 | SE | 23.02.2006 | ES | 06.03.2006 | PT | 24.04.2006 | [2007/45] |
Former [2007/36] | AT | 23.11.2005 | |
IT | 23.11.2005 | ||
DK | 23.02.2006 | ||
GR | 23.02.2006 | ||
SE | 23.02.2006 | ||
ES | 06.03.2006 | ||
PT | 24.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | AT | 23.11.2005 | |
DK | 23.02.2006 | ||
GR | 23.02.2006 | ||
SE | 23.02.2006 | ||
ES | 06.03.2006 | ||
PT | 24.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/38] | AT | 23.11.2005 | |
DK | 23.02.2006 | ||
GR | 23.02.2006 | ||
SE | 23.02.2006 | ||
ES | 06.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/34] | AT | 23.11.2005 | |
DK | 23.02.2006 | ||
SE | 23.02.2006 | ||
ES | 06.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/33] | SE | 23.02.2006 | |
ES | 06.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/27] | SE | 23.02.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS5015754B ; | [A]JPS61114743 ; | [A]US3053775 (ABBOTT WILLIAM F) [A] 1-11* column W *; | [A]GB1520513 (SHOEI CHEMICAL IND CO) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [A]WO8707559 (HYPERION CATALYSIS INT [US]) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1975, no. 27, Database accession no. 1975-45345W, XP002212621 & JPS5015754B B1 19750607 (SHOEI CHEM IND KK) [A] 1-11 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19861008), vol. 010, no. 296, Database accession no. (C - 377), & JP61114743 A 19860602 (CHOBE TAGUCHI) [A] 1-11 * abstract * |