EP1202124 - Device and method for precisely aligning receiving sheets with an increased operational time window [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 06.09.2013 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2013 | New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings | 06.09.2013 | Withdrawal of application | published on 09.10.2013 [2013/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester NY 14650-2201 / US | ||
Former [2004/37] | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650 / US | ||
Former [2002/18] | For all designated states Heidelberger Druckmaschinen Aktiengesellschaft Kurfürsten-Anlage 52-60 69115 Heidelberg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dobbertin, Michael T. 292 East Lake Road Honeoye, NY 14471 / US | 02 /
Winterberger, John A. 109 Thistlewood Lane Spencerport, NY 14559 / US | [2002/18] | Representative(s) | Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/19] | WAGNER & GEYER Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/18] | Wagner, Karl H., Dipl.-Ing. Wagner & Geyer, Patentanwälte, Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/40] | Haile, Helen Cynthia, et al Kodak Limited Patent, W92-3A, Headstone Drive Harrow, Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | ||
Former [2002/18] | Franzen, Peter, et al Heidelberger Druckmaschinen AG, Kurfürsten-Anlage 52-60 69115 Heidelberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 01124333.4 | 22.10.2001 | [2002/18] | Priority number, date | US20000698513 | 27.10.2000 Original published format: US 698513 | [2002/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1202124 | Date: | 02.05.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1202124 | Date: | 03.06.2009 | [2009/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.05.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G03G15/00, B65H9/14 | [2002/18] | CPC: |
B65H9/002 (EP,US);
G03G15/6564 (EP,US);
G03G15/6567 (EP,US);
B65H2301/331 (EP,US);
B65H2511/514 (EP,US);
B65H2513/10 (EP,US);
B65H2513/20 (EP,US);
G03G2215/00561 (EP,US);
G03G2215/00599 (EP,US);
G03G2215/00721 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
B65H2511/514, B65H2220/01 (EP,US);
B65H2513/10, B65H2220/02 (US,EP);
B65H2513/20, B65H2220/02 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, NL [2010/06] |
Former [2002/18] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren für ein vergrössertes betriebliches Zeitfenster zur passgenauen Ausrichtung von Empfangsbogen | [2002/18] | English: | Device and method for precisely aligning receiving sheets with an increased operational time window | [2002/18] | French: | Dispositif et méthode pour aligner précisément des feuilles réceptrices avec une fenêtre temporelle opérationnelle augmentée | [2002/18] | Examination procedure | 03.12.2009 | Examination requested [2010/02] | 04.12.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 08.01.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, PT, SE, TR | 13.01.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 23.08.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.02.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.10.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 24.12.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.09.2013 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 08.10.2013 | 03.09.2013 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2013/41] | 08.10.2013 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.01.2010 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 24.12.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 24.12.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 18.01.2013 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 07.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 10.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 05.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5078384 (MOORE STEVEN R [US]) [Y] 1-15 * column 6, line 57 - column 7, line 49; figure - *; | [DA]US5731680 (WINTERBERGER JOHN ANDREW [US], et al) [DA] 1-15* column 5; figure - *; | [A]JPH11223969 (FUJI XEROX CO LTD) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [Y]EP0994397 (CANON KK [JP]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0033] , [0049] , [0050] , [0057] , [0073]; figure - *; | [Y]JP2000143036 (CANON KK) [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0024] , [0057] , [0061] , [0065] , [0076] * | Examination | US5322273 |