EP1197754 - Methods and device for detecting prostate specific antigen (PSA) [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.05.2004 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.05.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.07.2004 [2004/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wang, Tang J. 12671 Acacia Terrace Poway, CA., 92064 / US | [2002/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2002/16] | Representative(s) | Grund, Martin, et al Dr. Volker Vossius Patentanwaltskanzlei Geibelstrasse 6 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/16] | Grund, Martin, Dr., et al Dr. Volker Vossius, Patentanwaltskanzlei, Holbeinstrasse 5 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01124456.3 | 11.10.2001 | [2002/16] | Priority number, date | US20000687017 | 13.10.2000 Original published format: US 687017 | [2002/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1197754 | Date: | 17.04.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.03.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/543 | [2002/16] | CPC: |
G01N33/57434 (EP,US);
G01N33/54306 (EP,US);
G01N33/54388 (US);
G01N33/558 (EP);
Y10S435/975 (EP,US);
Y10S436/81 (EP,US);
Y10S436/825 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2003/02] |
Former [2002/16] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Methoden und Vorrichtung zur Detektion von PSA | [2002/16] | English: | Methods and device for detecting prostate specific antigen (PSA) | [2002/16] | French: | Méthodes et dispositif pour la détection de PSA | [2002/16] | Examination procedure | 09.09.2002 | Examination requested [2002/46] | 17.10.2002 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 07.02.2003 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | 10.06.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.12.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/28] | 30.01.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 25.11.2002 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 25.11.2002 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 25.11.2002 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 25.11.2002 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 25.11.2002 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 25.11.2002 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 25.11.2002 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 25.11.2002 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 25.11.2002 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 25.11.2002 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 25.11.2002 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 25.11.2002 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 25.11.2002 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 25.11.2002 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 25.11.2002 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 25.11.2002 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5928878 (ALLARD WILLIAM JEFFREY [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * column 16, lines 36-40; claim 6 *; | [X]EP0987551 (BAYER AG [US]) [X] 10 * claim 1 *; | [A] - JUNG KLAUS ET AL, "Rapid detection of elevated prostate-specific antigen levels in blood: Performance of various membrane strip tests compared.", UROLOGY, (199901), vol. 53, no. 1, ISSN 0090-4295, pages 155 - 160, XP002188761 [A] 1-16 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0090-4295(98)00419-1 |