EP1203595 - Method for marking medical long objects, and catheter obtained thereby [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.11.2007 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Terumo Kabushiki Kaisha No. 44-1, Hatagaya 2-chome, Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/04] | For all designated states TERUMO KABUSHIKI KAISHA No. 44-1, Hatagaya 2-chome, Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151 / JP | ||
Former [2002/19] | For all designated states TERUMO KABUSHIKI KAISHA No. 44-1, Hatagaya 2-chome, Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Iwami, Jun Terumo Kabushiki Kaisha, 150, Maimaigi-cho Fujinomiya-shi, Shizuoka / JP | 02 /
Fujimagari, Hideki Terumo Kabushiki Kaisha, 150, Maimaigi-cho Fujinomiya-shi, Shizuoka / JP | [2002/19] | Representative(s) | Casalonga, Axel, et al Casalonga & Partners Bayerstrasse 73 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/19] | Casalonga, Axel, et al BUREAU D.A. CASALONGA - JOSSE Morassistrasse 8 80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01125342.4 | 29.10.2001 | [2002/19] | Priority number, date | JP20000330522 | 30.10.2000 Original published format: JP 2000330522 | [2002/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1203595 | Date: | 08.05.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1203595 | Date: | 24.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.02.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A61M25/00 | [2002/19] | CPC: |
B41M5/267 (EP,US);
A61M25/00 (EP,US);
A61M25/0108 (EP,US);
A61M2025/0008 (EP,US);
A61M2025/006 (EP,US);
A61M25/0009 (EP,US);
Y10S430/146 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/19] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Markieren medizinischer Langkörper und damit hergestellter Katheter | [2002/19] | English: | Method for marking medical long objects, and catheter obtained thereby | [2002/19] | French: | Méthode de marquage d'objets médicaux allongés et cathéter obtenu ainsi | [2002/19] | Examination procedure | 29.10.2002 | Examination requested [2003/01] | 28.12.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.07.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.03.2006 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 27.03.2006 | 27.03.2006 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 01.08.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.12.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 01.12.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.10.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 24.01.2007 | BE | 24.01.2007 | CH | 24.01.2007 | CY | 24.01.2007 | DK | 24.01.2007 | FI | 24.01.2007 | IT | 24.01.2007 | LI | 24.01.2007 | NL | 24.01.2007 | TR | 24.01.2007 | SE | 24.04.2007 | GR | 25.04.2007 | ES | 05.05.2007 | PT | 25.06.2007 | [2009/42] |
Former [2009/33] | AT | 24.01.2007 | |
BE | 24.01.2007 | ||
CH | 24.01.2007 | ||
CY | 24.01.2007 | ||
DK | 24.01.2007 | ||
FI | 24.01.2007 | ||
IT | 24.01.2007 | ||
LI | 24.01.2007 | ||
NL | 24.01.2007 | ||
SE | 24.04.2007 | ||
GR | 25.04.2007 | ||
ES | 05.05.2007 | ||
PT | 25.06.2007 | ||
Former [2008/23] | AT | 24.01.2007 | |
BE | 24.01.2007 | ||
CH | 24.01.2007 | ||
DK | 24.01.2007 | ||
FI | 24.01.2007 | ||
IT | 24.01.2007 | ||
LI | 24.01.2007 | ||
NL | 24.01.2007 | ||
SE | 24.04.2007 | ||
GR | 25.04.2007 | ||
ES | 05.05.2007 | ||
PT | 25.06.2007 | ||
Former [2008/19] | AT | 24.01.2007 | |
BE | 24.01.2007 | ||
CH | 24.01.2007 | ||
DK | 24.01.2007 | ||
FI | 24.01.2007 | ||
LI | 24.01.2007 | ||
NL | 24.01.2007 | ||
SE | 24.04.2007 | ||
GR | 25.04.2007 | ||
ES | 05.05.2007 | ||
PT | 25.06.2007 | ||
Former [2008/01] | AT | 24.01.2007 | |
BE | 24.01.2007 | ||
CH | 24.01.2007 | ||
DK | 24.01.2007 | ||
FI | 24.01.2007 | ||
LI | 24.01.2007 | ||
NL | 24.01.2007 | ||
SE | 24.04.2007 | ||
ES | 05.05.2007 | ||
PT | 25.06.2007 | ||
Former [2007/46] | AT | 24.01.2007 | |
CH | 24.01.2007 | ||
DK | 24.01.2007 | ||
FI | 24.01.2007 | ||
LI | 24.01.2007 | ||
NL | 24.01.2007 | ||
SE | 24.04.2007 | ||
ES | 05.05.2007 | ||
PT | 25.06.2007 | ||
Former [2007/39] | CH | 24.01.2007 | |
FI | 24.01.2007 | ||
LI | 24.01.2007 | ||
NL | 24.01.2007 | ||
SE | 24.04.2007 | ||
ES | 05.05.2007 | ||
PT | 25.06.2007 | ||
Former [2007/38] | CH | 24.01.2007 | |
FI | 24.01.2007 | ||
LI | 24.01.2007 | ||
SE | 24.04.2007 | ||
PT | 25.06.2007 | ||
Former [2007/37] | CH | 24.01.2007 | |
FI | 24.01.2007 | ||
LI | 24.01.2007 | ||
PT | 25.06.2007 | ||
Former [2007/36] | FI | 24.01.2007 | |
PT | 25.06.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO9401160 (ARROW INT INVESTMENT [US]) [Y] 2,5 * page 5, line 22 - line 24 *; | [YD]US5379779 (ROWLAND CHRISTOPHER A [US], et al) [YD] 4 * abstract *; | [XY]EP0669365 (NIPPON KAYAKU KK [JP]) [X] 1,3,6,7 * the whole document * [Y] 2,4,5; | [A]US5454881 (FISCHER MARK F [US]) [A] * abstract *; | [A] - MVERS J, "LASERS MAKE THEIR MARK ON VARIETY OF PLASTICS PARTS", MODERN PLASTICS INTERNATIONAL, MCGRAW-HILL,INC. LAUSANNE, CH, (19931001), vol. 23, no. 10, ISSN 0026-8283, pages 29 - 30,32, XP000397542 [A] 1-7 * the whole document * |