EP1204224 - Mobile communication system in multi-carrier CDMA scheme using short code and long code [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.02.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.11.2007 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: IT | published on 12.12.2007 [2007/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NTT DoCoMo, Inc. 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/15] | For all designated states NTT DoCoMo, Inc. 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | ||
Former [2002/19] | For all designated states NTT DoCoMo, Inc. 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hanada, Yukiko 2-16-8-205, Sasage, Konan-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 02 /
Higuchi, Kenichi 3-11-11, Take Yokosuka-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 03 /
Abeta, Sadayuki 4-18-4-102, Nobi Yokosuka-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 04 /
Sawahashi, Mamoru 1-59-17, Tomioka-Nishi, Kanazawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | [2002/19] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/19] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01125484.4 | 06.11.2001 | [2002/19] | Priority number, date | JP20000337993 | 06.11.2000 Original published format: JP 2000337993 | [2002/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1204224 | Date: | 08.05.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1204224 | Date: | 23.06.2004 | [2004/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1204224 | Date: | 12.04.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.05.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/26, H04L5/02 | [2004/26] | CPC: |
H04B7/2628 (EP,US);
H04J13/16 (KR)
|
Former IPC [2002/19] | H04B7/26 | Designated contracting states | DE, FI, FR, GB, IT [2005/11] |
Former [2002/19] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Mehrträger CDMA mobile Kommunikationsanordnung mit kurzem und lagem Kode | [2002/19] | English: | Mobile communication system in multi-carrier CDMA scheme using short code and long code | [2002/19] | French: | Système de communication mobile à multi-porteuses CDMA utilisant un code court et un code long | [2002/19] | Examination procedure | 06.11.2001 | Examination requested [2002/19] | 12.11.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.03.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.10.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.01.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 30.01.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.01.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2007/50] |
Former [2007/36] | IT | 12.04.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5757766 (SUGITA TAKEHIRO [JP]) [A] 4,10,16 * figure 6 *; | [A]EP0910181 (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [A] 4,10,16 * figure 3 *; | [A]EP0929161 (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [A] 4,10,16 * figures 4,5 *; | [A]EP1039684 (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [A] 5,11,17 * abstract *; | [XY] - ABETA S ET AL, "FORWARD LINK CAPACITY OF COHERENT DS-CDMA AND MC-CDMA BROADBAND PACKET WIRELESS ACCESS IN A MULTI-CELL ENVIRONMENT", VTC 2000-FALL. IEEE VTS 52ND. VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE. BOSTON, MA, SEPT. 24 - 28, 2000, IEEE VEHICULAR TECHNOLGY CONFERENCE, NEW YORK, NY: IEEE, US, (20000924), vol. 5 OF 6. CONF. 52, ISBN 0-7803-6508-9, pages 2213 - 2218, XP000988409 [X] 2,6,8,12 * page 2215, paragraphs 2.2,3; figure 3 * [Y] 1,3,7,9,13-15,18,19 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/VETECF.2000.883259 | [Y] - HIGUCHI K ET AL, "Fast cell search algorithm in DS-CDMA mobile radio using long spreading codes", VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE, 1997, IEEE 47TH PHOENIX, AZ, USA 4-7 MAY 1997, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, US, (19970504), ISBN 0-7803-3659-3, pages 1430 - 1434, XP010229096 [Y] 1,3,7,9,13-15,18,19 * page 1430, paragraph I; figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/VETEC.1997.605496 | [PX] - ATARASHI H ET AL, "PERFORMANCE EVALUATION OF COHERENT HIGH-SPEED TD-OFCDM BROADBAND PACKET WIRELESS ACCESS IN FORWARD LINK EMPLOYING MULTI-LEVEL MODULATION AND HYBRID ARQ", IEICE TRANSACTIONS ON FUNDAMENTALS OF ELECTRONICS, COMMUNICATIONS AND COMPUTER SCIENCES, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRONICS INFORMATION AND COMM. ENG. TOKYO, JP, (20010701), vol. E84-A, no. 7, ISSN 0916-8508, pages 1670 - 1680, XP001025070 [PX] 2,6,8,12 * page 1673, paragraph 3; figures 2,4 * | [A] - MOTTIER D ET AL, "A SPREADING SEQUENCE ALLOCATION PROCEDURE FOR MC-CDMA TRANSMISSION SYSTEMS", VTC 2000-FALL. IEEE VTS 52ND. VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE. BOSTON, MA, SEPT. 24 - 28, 2000, IEEE VEHICULAR TECHNOLGY CONFERENCE, NEW YORK, NY: IEEE, US, (20000924), vol. 3 OF 6. CONF. 52, ISBN 0-7803-6508-9, pages 1270 - 1275, XP000988578 [A] 1-19 * the whole document * |