EP1307081 - Thermal dissipation structure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.04.2006 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.04.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.05.2006 [2006/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HannStar Display Corp. 12F., No. 480, Rueiguang Road Neihu District Taipei City / TW | [N/P] |
Former [2003/18] | For all designated states Hannstar Display Corp. 5F, No. 115 Sec. 3, Min-Sheng E. Road Taipei, Taiwan / TW | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hung, Chien-Ju No.71, Tzuwen Road Taoyuan / TW | [2003/18] | Representative(s) | Becker Kurig & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Bavariastraße 7 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/18] | Becker Kurig Straus Patentanwälte Bavariastrasse 7 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01125557.7 | 25.10.2001 | [2003/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1307081 | Date: | 02.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1307081 | Date: | 01.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.04.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H05K5/02, H05K7/20 | [2003/18] | CPC: |
H05K5/0213 (EP);
H05K7/20009 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2004/04] |
Former [2003/18] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Wärmeableitungsstruktur | [2003/18] | English: | Thermal dissipation structure | [2003/18] | French: | Structure de dissipation thermique | [2003/18] | Examination procedure | 08.05.2003 | Examination requested [2003/28] | 24.09.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.11.2003 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 13.01.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.02.2004 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, FR, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | 10.12.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.03.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 21.03.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.03.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 10.12.2003 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 10.12.2003 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 10.12.2003 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 10.12.2003 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 10.12.2003 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 10.12.2003 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 10.12.2003 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 10.12.2003 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 10.12.2003 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 10.12.2003 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 10.12.2003 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 10.12.2003 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 10.12.2003 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 10.12.2003 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 10.12.2003 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 10.12.2003 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 10.12.2003 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4840286 (HEBERLING JAMES R [US], et al) [A] 1,2,8-12,16,17 * column 2, lines 13-18 * * column 3, lines 3-16 * * column 3, lines 42-50 * * column 4, lines 46-60; figures 2-6 *; | [XA]US5730512 (HEIRICH DOUGLAS L [US]) [X] 10,12,16,17 * column 1, lines 15-45 * * column 1, lines 60-62 * * column 2, lines 2,3 * * column 3, lines 6-31 * * column 3, lines 44-54 * * column 5, lines 24-26 * * column 5, lines 42-45 * * column 5, lines 57-63 * * figures 2A,3,4A-4E * [A] 1,2,8,9,11; | [A] - ADDITIONAL VENTILATION SLOTS IN A MONITOR ENCLOSURE, IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, IBM CORP. NEW YORK, US, VOL. 32, NR. 8B, PAGE(S) 221-222, ISSN 0018-8689, XP000082426 [A] 1,10 * abstract * |