EP1201893 - Pressure difference safety valve [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.11.2005 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 15.10.2008 [2008/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PowerAvenue Corporation 4215 Harding Road Suite 1202 Nashville TN 37205 / US | [2005/44] |
Former [2004/27] | For all designated states H2-Interpower Brennstoffzellensysteme GmbH Mühlenstrasse 4 91126 Schwabach / DE | ||
Former [2002/18] | For all designated states H2-Interpower GmbH Mühlenstrasse 4 91126 Schwabach / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ruthrof, Klaus Mühlenstrasse 4 91126 Schwabach / DE | [2002/18] | Representative(s) | REHBERG HÜPPE + PARTNER Patentanwälte PartG mbB Robert-Gernhardt-Platz 1 37073 Göttingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/42] | Rehberg Hüppe + Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 31 62 37021 Göttingen / DE | ||
Former [2005/34] | Rehberg Hüppe + Partner Postfach 31 62 37021 Göttingen / DE | ||
Former [2004/38] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2002/18] | Patentanwälte Rehberg + Hüppe Postfach 31 62 37021 Göttingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 01125682.3 | 26.10.2001 | [2002/18] | Priority number, date | DE2000153609 | 28.10.2000 Original published format: DE 10053609 | [2002/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1201893 | Date: | 02.05.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1201893 | Date: | 26.03.2003 | [2003/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.02.2003 | Classification | IPC: | F02B43/10, F02M21/02 | [2002/18] | CPC: |
C25B15/00 (EP);
F02M25/12 (EP);
Y02T10/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2003/51] |
Former [2002/18] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Differenzdrucksicherheitsventil | [2002/18] | English: | Pressure difference safety valve | [2002/18] | French: | Obturateur de sécurité aux différences de pression | [2002/18] | Examination procedure | 27.09.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/51] | 15.07.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2005/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 12.11.2003 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 12.11.2003 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.11.2003 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 12.11.2003 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 12.11.2003 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.11.2003 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 12.11.2003 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 12.11.2003 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 12.11.2003 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 12.11.2003 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 12.11.2003 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 12.11.2003 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.11.2003 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 12.11.2003 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 12.11.2003 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 12.11.2003 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 12.11.2003 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 12.11.2003 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 12.11.2003 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Stay/Interruption | 01.12.2003 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: legal prevention of applicant | [2004/31] | 02.11.2004 | Resumption of proceedings | [2005/31] | 01.12.2003 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: legal prevention of applicant | [2005/31] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9405831 (NESTE OY [FI], et al) [X] 1-10 * abstract * * page 3, line 9 - page 4, line 12 * * page 8, line 8 - page 10, line 29 * * page 14, line 31 - page 16, line 3 *; | [XA]EP0296736 (ICI PLC [GB]) [X] 1-3,9,10 * abstract * * column 2, line 14 - column 3, line 35 * * column 9, line 13 - column 11, line L * [A] 4-8; | [XA]DE597180 (JAKOB EMIL NOEGGERATH DR) [X] 1,2,9 * figure - * * page 1, line 1 - page 3, line 33 * [A] 3-8,10; | [DA]DE19916240 (PILLER GMBH [DE]) [DA] 1 * abstract * * column 4, line 2 - line 29 * |