EP1309091 - Pulse signal generator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.12.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hirose Electric Co., Ltd. 5-23 Oosaki 5-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/19] | For all designated states HIROSE ELECTRIC CO., LTD. 5-23 Oosaki 5-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ito, Tomoaki Hirose Electric Co., Ltd., 5-23 Oosaki 5-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Tanaka, Masami Hirose Electric Co., Ltd., 5-23 Oosaki 5-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Kubota, Tadashi Hirose Electric Co., Ltd., 5-23 Oosaki 5-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Masuzaki, Yasuhiro c/o Hirose Electric Co., Ltd. 5-23, Oosaki 5-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | [2003/19] | Representative(s) | Pätzold, Herbert Pätzold, Tandler, Riegger & Kollegen Pasinger Strasse 6 82166 Gräfelfing / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/19] | Pätzold, Herbert, Dr. Pätzold, Tandler, Riegger & Kollegen, Steubstrasse 10 82116 Gräfelfing / DE | Application number, filing date | 01126056.9 | 01.11.2001 | [2003/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1309091 | Date: | 07.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.04.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H03K17/95 | [2003/19] | CPC: |
H03K17/9515 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2004/05] |
Former [2003/19] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Impulssignalgenerator | [2003/19] | English: | Pulse signal generator | [2003/19] | French: | Générateur d'impulsion de signal | [2003/19] | Examination procedure | 28.08.2003 | Examination requested [2003/44] | 08.11.2003 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 26.02.2004 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | 12.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.07.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/02] | 24.08.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 12.12.2003 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 12.12.2003 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.12.2003 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 12.12.2003 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 12.12.2003 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 12.12.2003 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 12.12.2003 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 12.12.2003 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 12.12.2003 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.12.2003 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 12.12.2003 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 12.12.2003 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 12.12.2003 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 12.12.2003 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.12.2003 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]EP0987523 (HIROSE ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP]) [DA] 1-3 * column 7, line 5 - column 8, line 21; figure 8 *; | [DA]EP0987522 (HIROSE ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP]) [DA] 1-3* column 7, line 33 - column 9, line 42; figures 8-11 * |