EP1209217 - Fuel oils with improved lubricating activity, containing reaction products of fatty acids with short-chained oil-soluble amines [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.01.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.01.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.02.2010 [2010/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Clariant Produkte (Deutschland) GmbH Brüningstrasse 50 65929 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [2006/11] |
Former [2002/22] | For all designated states Clariant GmbH Brüningstrasse 50 65929 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Krull, Matthias, Dr. Eisenbruchstrasse 3b 46147 Oberhausen / DE | 02 /
Kupetz, Markus Sterkader Strasse 169 46539 Dinslaken / DE | [2002/22] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2006/11] |
Former [2002/22] | Mikulecky, Klaus, et al Clariant Service GmbH Patente, Marken, Lizenzen Am Unisys-Park 1 D-65843 Sulzbach/Ts. / DE | Application number, filing date | 01126253.2 | 06.11.2001 | [2002/22] | Priority number, date | DE2000158356 | 24.11.2000 Original published format: DE 10058356 | [2002/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1209217 | Date: | 29.05.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1209217 | Date: | 09.07.2003 | [2003/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1209217 | Date: | 25.02.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.05.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C10L10/04, C10L10/08, C10L1/222, C10L1/224 | [2008/36] | CPC: |
C10L10/08 (EP,US);
C10L1/221 (EP,US);
C10L1/2222 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2002/22] | C10L1/22, C10L10/04 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2009/05] |
Former [2004/14] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | ||
Former [2002/22] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Brennstofföle mit verbesserter Schmierwirkung, enthaltend Umsetzungsprodukte aus Fettsäuren mit kurzkettigen öllöslichen Aminen | [2002/22] | English: | Fuel oils with improved lubricating activity, containing reaction products of fatty acids with short-chained oil-soluble amines | [2002/22] | French: | Huiles combustibles à pouvoir lubrifiant amélioré, contenant des produits de réaction d'acides gras avec des amines solubles dans l'huile à chaînes courtes | [2002/22] | Examination procedure | 09.01.2004 | Examination requested [2004/12] | 09.08.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.09.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.10.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.11.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.01.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.04.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.02.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.11.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.12.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 10.12.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.11.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 01.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE1645886 (VEBA CHEMIE AG, et al) [X] 1-4,6-9,11 * page 4 - page 6; claims 1,2 *; | [A]DE2852541 (BEVEROLFABRIEKEN); | [A]EP0798364 (ORONITE JAPAN LIMITED [JP]); | [X]WO9804656 (ELF ANTAR FRANCE [FR], et al) [X] 1-4,6,9-11 * example 4; claims 1,6-9,11 *; | [X]WO9933938 (ELF ANTAR FRANCE [FR], et al) [X] 1-4,6,9-11 * claims 1,6,8,10 * |