EP1310309 - Tangential rolling head [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.10.2005 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 10.09.2008 [2008/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fette GmbH Grabauer Strasse 24 21493 Schwarzenbek / DE | [2003/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Focken, Andreas Emil Nolde Weg 24 D-21493 Schwarzenbek / DE | [2003/20] | Representative(s) | Hauck Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Postfach 11 31 53 20431 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/37] | Hauck Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Neuer Wall 50 20354 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2003/20] | Patentanwälte Hauck, Graalfs, Wehnert, Döring, Siemons, Schildberg Neuer Wall 41 20354 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 01126354.8 | 07.11.2001 | [2003/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1310309 | Date: | 14.05.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1310309 | Date: | 15.12.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.05.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B21H3/04 | [2003/20] | CPC: |
B21H3/048 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE [2004/06] |
Former [2003/20] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Tangential-Rollkopf | [2003/20] | English: | Tangential rolling head | [2003/20] | French: | Tête de roulage tangentiel | [2003/20] | Examination procedure | 17.11.2001 | Examination requested [2003/20] | 15.11.2003 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 02.01.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.02.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 11.02.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.04.2004 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Opposition(s) | 16.09.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 16.01.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2004 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2004 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2004 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2004 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]SU1098641 ; | [A]DE9312116U (WAGNER MASCHF GUSTAV [DE]) [A] 1,6 * page 6, line 6 - line 33; figure 2 *; | [A]DE29610183U (FETTE WILHELM GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * page 14, line 3 - page 16, line 6; figure - *; | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1985, no. 05, Database accession no. 1985-030182, XP002041998 & SU1098641 A 19840623 (KIEV POLY) [A] 1 * abstract * |