EP1215790 - Mechanism for fixing a bus bar component [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.02.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.08.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 05.09.2007 [2007/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Jean Müller GmbH Elektrotechnische Fabrik H.J.-Müller-Strasse 7 65343 Eltville / DE | [2003/03] |
Former [2002/25] | For all designated states JEAN MÜLLER GmbH, Elektrotechnische Fabrik Friedrichstrasse 21 D-65343 Eltville / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bollmann, Dipl.-Ing. Johannes Wihelm-Löhrs-Weg 12 48231 Warendorf / DE | [2002/25] | Representative(s) | Quermann, Helmut, et al Quermann - Sturm - Weilnau Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Unter den Eichen 5 65195 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/25] | Quermann, Helmut, Dipl.-Ing., et al Unter den Eichen 7 65195 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 01126394.4 | 07.11.2001 | [2002/25] | Priority number, date | DE2000162642 | 15.12.2000 Original published format: DE 10062642 | [2002/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1215790 | Date: | 19.06.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1215790 | Date: | 23.04.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.04.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H02G5/02, H02B1/21 | [2002/25] | CPC: |
H02G5/025 (EP);
H02B1/21 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/11] |
Former [2002/25] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Befestigungsmechanismus für eine elektrische Sammelschienenkomponente | [2002/25] | English: | Mechanism for fixing a bus bar component | [2002/25] | French: | Mécanisme de fixation d'un composant d'un jeu de barres de distribution | [2002/25] | Examination procedure | 02.05.2002 | Examination requested [2002/27] | 23.10.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.12.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 27.12.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.01.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/16] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 23.04.2003 | FR | 23.04.2003 | GB | 23.04.2003 | IE | 23.04.2003 | IT | 23.04.2003 | TR | 23.04.2003 | DK | 23.07.2003 | GR | 23.07.2003 | PT | 23.07.2003 | SE | 23.07.2003 | CY | 07.11.2003 | LU | 07.11.2003 | BE | 30.11.2003 | MC | 30.11.2003 | [2007/36] |
Former [2006/51] | FI | 23.04.2003 | |
FR | 23.04.2003 | ||
GB | 23.04.2003 | ||
IE | 23.04.2003 | ||
TR | 23.04.2003 | ||
DK | 23.07.2003 | ||
GR | 23.07.2003 | ||
PT | 23.07.2003 | ||
SE | 23.07.2003 | ||
CY | 07.11.2003 | ||
LU | 07.11.2003 | ||
BE | 30.11.2003 | ||
MC | 30.11.2003 | ||
Former [2006/14] | FI | 23.04.2003 | |
FR | 23.04.2003 | ||
GB | 23.04.2003 | ||
IE | 23.04.2003 | ||
DK | 23.07.2003 | ||
GR | 23.07.2003 | ||
PT | 23.07.2003 | ||
SE | 23.07.2003 | ||
CY | 07.11.2003 | ||
LU | 07.11.2003 | ||
BE | 30.11.2003 | ||
MC | 30.11.2003 | ||
Former [2005/02] | FI | 23.04.2003 | |
GB | 23.04.2003 | ||
IE | 23.04.2003 | ||
DK | 23.07.2003 | ||
GR | 23.07.2003 | ||
PT | 23.07.2003 | ||
SE | 23.07.2003 | ||
CY | 07.11.2003 | ||
LU | 07.11.2003 | ||
BE | 30.11.2003 | ||
MC | 30.11.2003 | ||
Former [2005/01] | FI | 23.04.2003 | |
GB | 23.04.2003 | ||
IE | 23.04.2003 | ||
DK | 23.07.2003 | ||
GR | 23.07.2003 | ||
PT | 23.07.2003 | ||
SE | 23.07.2003 | ||
CY | 07.11.2003 | ||
LU | 07.11.2003 | ||
BE | 30.11.2003 | ||
Former [2004/39] | FI | 23.04.2003 | |
GB | 23.04.2003 | ||
IE | 23.04.2003 | ||
DK | 23.07.2003 | ||
GR | 23.07.2003 | ||
PT | 23.07.2003 | ||
SE | 23.07.2003 | ||
CY | 07.11.2003 | ||
LU | 07.11.2003 | ||
Former [2004/36] | FI | 23.04.2003 | |
GB | 23.04.2003 | ||
IE | 23.04.2003 | ||
DK | 23.07.2003 | ||
GR | 23.07.2003 | ||
PT | 23.07.2003 | ||
SE | 23.07.2003 | ||
CY | 07.11.2003 | ||
Former [2004/23] | FI | 23.04.2003 | |
GB | 23.04.2003 | ||
IE | 23.04.2003 | ||
DK | 23.07.2003 | ||
GR | 23.07.2003 | ||
PT | 23.07.2003 | ||
SE | 23.07.2003 | ||
Former [2004/22] | FI | 23.04.2003 | |
GB | 23.04.2003 | ||
IE | 23.04.2003 | ||
GR | 23.07.2003 | ||
PT | 23.07.2003 | ||
SE | 23.07.2003 | ||
Former [2004/15] | FI | 23.04.2003 | |
IE | 23.04.2003 | ||
GR | 23.07.2003 | ||
PT | 23.07.2003 | ||
SE | 23.07.2003 | ||
Former [2004/05] | FI | 23.04.2003 | |
GR | 23.07.2003 | ||
PT | 23.07.2003 | ||
SE | 23.07.2003 | ||
Former [2004/02] | GR | 23.07.2003 | |
PT | 23.07.2003 | ||
SE | 23.07.2003 | ||
Former [2004/01] | PT | 23.07.2003 | |
SE | 23.07.2003 | ||
Former [2003/41] | SE | 23.07.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0170161 (WOHNER GMBH ALFRED [DE]) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [DA]DE4329428 (MUELLER JEAN OHG ELEKTROTECH [DE]) [DA] 1 * the whole document * |