EP1205733 - Method and device for providing information related to activity of user [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.02.2008 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.02.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.03.2008 [2008/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi Osaka / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/13] | For all designated states SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi Osaka / JP | ||
Former [2002/20] | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi Osaka / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nakagawa, Katsuya 2-16-10, Saganakadai, Kizu-cho Soraku-gun, Kyoto / JP | [2007/13] |
Former [2002/20] | 01 /
Nakagawa, Katsuya 2-16-10, Saganakadai, Kitzu-cho Soraku-gun, Kyoto / JP | Representative(s) | Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB St.-Martin-Straße 58 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/20] | Müller . Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte Innere Wiener Strasse 17 81667 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01126396.9 | 07.11.2001 | [2002/20] | Priority number, date | JP20000344946 | 13.11.2000 Original published format: JP 2000344946 | [2002/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1205733 | Date: | 15.05.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1205733 | Date: | 10.12.2003 | [2003/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1205733 | Date: | 28.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.10.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G01C21/26, G01C21/36, G08G1/0968, G06Q10/00 | [2006/47] | CPC: |
G08G1/096775 (EP,US);
G01C21/26 (EP,US);
G08G1/0962 (EP,US);
G08G1/096716 (EP,US);
G08G1/096741 (EP,US);
G08G1/096811 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2003/50] | G01C21/26, G01C21/36, G08G1/0968, G06F17/60 | ||
Former IPC [2002/20] | G01C21/26 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/36] |
Former [2002/20] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Bereitstellen von Information über die Tätigkeit des Benutzers | [2002/20] | English: | Method and device for providing information related to activity of user | [2002/20] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour fournir des informations sur les activités de l'utilisateur | [2002/20] | Examination procedure | 14.05.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.05.2004 | Examination requested [2004/29] | 28.07.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.11.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.04.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 06.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.10.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.02.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 14.02.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0785519 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 4-6,10-12,16-18,22-24,28-30,34-36 * column 10, line 35 - column 11, line 35 *; | [X]US5790974 (TOGNAZZINI BRUCE [US]) [X] 1,7,13,19,25,31 * column 6, lines 50-58 * * column 7, lines 45-57 ** column 13, lines 58-65 *; | [X]US5948040 (DELORME DAVID M [US], et al) [X] 1-36 * column 10, lines 34-62 * * column 11, lines 13-16 * * column 16, lines 56,57 * * column 22, lines 19-35 * * column 72, lines 2-19 * * column 73, lines 33-40 * * figure 9B * |