EP1207191 - Fixed-bed gasification furnace and method for the gasification of organic waste [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.07.2006 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.07.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.08.2006 [2006/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI JUKOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 5-1, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/21] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI JUKOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 5-1, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Arima, Kenichi, Nagasaki R&D Center Mitsubishi Jukogyo K.K., 5-717-1, Fukahori-machi Nagasaki-shi, Nagasaki-ken / JP | 02 /
Soda, Masahiro, Nagasaki R&D Center Mitsubishi Jukogyo K.K., 5-717-1, Fukahori-machi Nagasaki-shi, Nagasaki-ken / JP | 03 /
Yamamoto, Hisao Choryo Engineering K.K., 5-717-1, Fukahori-machi Nagasaki-shi, Nagasaki-ken / JP | 04 /
Sakai, Masayasu Choryo Engineering K.K., 5-717-1, Fukahori-machi Nagasaki-shi, Nagasaki-ken / JP | 05 /
Ohta, Hideaki, Nagasaki R&D Center Mitsubishi Jukogyo K.K., 5-717-1, Fukahori-machi Nagasaki-shi, Nagasaki-ken / JP | 06 /
Fujioka, Yuichi, Nagasaki R&D Center Mitsubishi Jukogyo K.K., 5-717-1, Fukahori-machi Nagasaki-shi, Nagasaki-ken / JP | [2002/21] | Representative(s) | Behrens, Dieter Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/21] | Behrens, Dieter, Dr.-Ing. Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01126577.4 | 14.07.1995 | [2002/21] | Priority number, date | JP19940298188 | 01.12.1994 Original published format: JP 29818894 | [2002/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1207191 | Date: | 22.05.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1207191 | Date: | 04.09.2002 | [2002/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1207191 | Date: | 21.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.07.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C10J3/16, C10J3/20, C10J3/72, F23G5/027 | [2002/36] | CPC: |
C09C1/482 (EP);
C10J3/02 (EP);
C10J3/20 (EP);
C10J3/66 (EP);
C10J3/723 (EP);
C10J2300/0906 (EP);
C10J2300/0946 (EP);
C10J2300/0959 (EP);
C10J2300/0973 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2002/21] | C10J3/42, C10J3/72 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [2002/21] | Title | German: | Festbettvergaser und Verfahren zur Vergasung von organischen Abfällen | [2002/21] | English: | Fixed-bed gasification furnace and method for the gasification of organic waste | [2002/21] | French: | Gazéificateur à lit fixe et méthode de gazéification de déchets organiques | [2002/21] | Examination procedure | 15.11.2001 | Examination requested [2002/21] | 22.12.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.06.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.07.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.08.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.09.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.11.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.01.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.05.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 12.05.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP95111105.3 / EP0693539 | Opposition(s) | 22.06.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 17.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 17.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 19.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 19.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4321877 (SCHMIDT H DEAN, et al) [A] 1,2 * column W *; | [A]EP0297425 (BBC BROWN BOVERI & CIE [DE]); | [A]US5094669 (HERBERT PETER [DE], et al) |