EP1225319 - Control device for the cooling circuit of an internal combustion engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 21.03.2008 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.03.2008 | Withdrawal of application | published on 23.04.2008 [2008/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Daimler AG Mercedesstrasse 137 70327 Stuttgart / DE | For all designated states Gustav Wahler GmbH u. Co.KG Hindenburgstrasse 146 73730 Esslingen / DE | [2007/52] |
Former [2007/16] | For all designated states DaimlerChrysler AG Mercedesstrasse 137 70327 Stuttgart / DE | ||
For all designated states Gustav Wahler GmbH u. Co.KG Hindenburgstrasse 146 73730 Esslingen / DE | |||
Former [2002/30] | For all designated states DaimlerChrysler AG Epplestrasse 225 70567 Stuttgart / DE | ||
For all designated states Gustav Wahler GmbH u. Co.KG Hindenburgstrasse 146 73730 Esslingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schröer, Dietmar, Dipl.-Ing. Bittenfelder Strasse 23 71686 Remseck / DE | 02 /
Weiss, Rainer, Dipl.-Ing. Josefstr. 26 72351 Geislingen / DE | 03 /
Zimmermann, Frank, Dipl.-Ing. Burgunderweg 6/1 69168 Wiesloch / DE | [2002/30] | Representative(s) | Kratzsch, Volkhard Patentanwalt Mülbergerstrasse 65 73728 Esslingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/30] | Kratzsch, Volkhard, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwalt, Mülbergerstrasse 65 73728 Esslingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 01126742.4 | 09.11.2001 | [2002/30] | Priority number, date | DE2001101826 | 17.01.2001 Original published format: DE 10101826 | [2002/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1225319 | Date: | 24.07.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1225319 | Date: | 12.05.2004 | [2004/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F01P7/16, F02B75/22 | [2002/30] | CPC: |
F01P7/16 (EP);
F02B75/22 (EP);
F16K11/0856 (EP);
F02B2075/1824 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/05] |
Former [2002/30] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Steuervorrichtung für den Kühlkreislauf einer Brennkraftmaschine | [2002/30] | English: | Control device for the cooling circuit of an internal combustion engine | [2002/30] | French: | Dispositif de commande pour le circuit de refroidissement d'un moteur à combustion interne | [2002/30] | Examination procedure | 23.10.2004 | Examination requested [2004/52] | 13.11.2004 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 03.03.2005 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) IT, SE | 14.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.01.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 15.03.2008 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2008/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 17.12.2004 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 17.12.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB624416 (JOSE JUAN CORDOVA) [A] 1-5 * page 1, line 9 - line 24 * * page 2, line 73 - page 3, line 57; figure - *; | [AD]DE19809124 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [AD] 1-4,6-8* abstract * | by applicant | DE4416039 | DE19809124 | EP0947750 | EP0961060 |