EP1207320 - Range shift display unit and range shift display method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.03.2007 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.03.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.04.2007 [2007/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AISIN AW CO., LTD. 10, Takane, Fujii-cho Anjo-shi Aichi-ken 444-1192 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/21] | For all designated states AISIN AW CO., LTD. 10, Takane, Fujii-cho Anjo-shi, Aichi-ken 444-1192 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Satou, Chikashi, c/o Aisin Aw Co., Ltd. 10, Takane, Fujii-cho Anjo-shi, Aichi-ken 444-1192 / JP | 02 /
Murase, Yoshitaka, c/o Aisin Aw Co., Ltd. 10, Takane, Fujii-cho Anjo-shi, Aichi-ken 444-1192 / JP | 03 /
Eishima, Hirotoshi, c/o Aisin Aw Co., Ltd. 10, Takane, Fujii-cho Anjo-shi, Aichi-ken 444-1192 / JP | [2002/21] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/34] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/21] | Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, Dipl.-Ing. Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner GbR, TBK-Patent, Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01127127.7 | 15.11.2001 | [2002/21] | Priority number, date | JP20000349724 | 16.11.2000 Original published format: JP 2000349724 | [2002/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1207320 | Date: | 22.05.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1207320 | Date: | 10.11.2004 | [2004/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.09.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F16H59/10, F16H63/42 | [2002/21] | CPC: |
F16H59/08 (EP,US);
F16H63/42 (EP,US);
F16H2063/423 (EP,US);
Y10T74/19251 (EP,US);
Y10T74/2003 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2005/30] |
Former [2002/21] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Schaltstufenanzeigeeinheit und Schaltstufenanzeigeverfahren | [2002/21] | English: | Range shift display unit and range shift display method | [2002/21] | French: | Afficheur de gamme de vitesse et procédé d'affichage des gammes de vitesse | [2002/21] | Examination procedure | 09.05.2005 | Examination requested [2005/27] | 29.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.10.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/14] | 15.11.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5009128 (SEIDEL WILLI [DE], et al) [X] 1-9 * column 1, line 7 - line 62 * * column 5, line 13 - line 16 *; | [X]GB1588880 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT) [X] 1,2,4-9 * the whole document *; | [X]DE3832970 (PORSCHE AG [DE]) [X] 1-6,9 * the whole document *; | [E]DE10048577 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [E] 1-9 * the whole document * |