EP1213307 - Continuous process for preparing thermoplastically processable polyurethane elastomers with high thermostability and constant viscosity [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.02.2007 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayer MaterialScience AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/11] | For all designated states Bayer MaterialScience AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | ||
Former [2002/24] | For all designated states Bayer Aktiengesellschaft 51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Müller, Friedemann, Dr. Am Steinacker 5 41470 Neuss / DE | 02 /
Bräuer, Wolfgang, Dr. Am Eselsdamm 1 51375 Leverkusen / DE | 03 /
Hoppe, Hans-Georg Kurlandweg 31 42799 Leichlingen / DE | 04 /
Wussow, Hans-Georg, Dr. Schimmelpfennigstrasse 59 40597 Düsseldorf / DE | 05 /
Wagner, Hans, Dr. Tizianstrasse 13 41539 Dormagen / DE | [2002/24] | Application number, filing date | 01127420.6 | 26.11.2001 | [2002/24] | Priority number, date | DE2000161067 | 08.12.2000 Original published format: DE 10061067 | [2002/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1213307 | Date: | 12.06.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1213307 | Date: | 19.04.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.03.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C08G18/08, C08G18/28, C08G18/32, C08G18/42 | [2002/24] | CPC: |
C08G18/3206 (EP,US);
C08G18/08 (KR);
C08G18/0895 (EP,US);
C08G18/2825 (EP,US);
C08G18/4238 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/24] | Title | German: | Kontinuierliches Verfahren zur Herstellung von thermoplastisch verarbeitbaren Polyurethanelastomeren mit hoher Thermostabilität und konstanter Viskosität | [2002/24] | English: | Continuous process for preparing thermoplastically processable polyurethane elastomers with high thermostability and constant viscosity | [2002/24] | French: | Procédé continu de préparation d'élastomères de polyuréthane à thermostabilité élevée et à viscosité constante | [2002/24] | Examination procedure | 12.12.2002 | Examination requested [2003/07] | 11.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.04.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.07.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.10.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.02.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 17.02.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.01.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 19.04.2006 | FI | 19.04.2006 | IE | 19.04.2006 | TR | 19.04.2006 | DK | 19.07.2006 | SE | 19.07.2006 | GR | 20.07.2006 | PT | 19.09.2006 | AT | 26.11.2006 | LU | 26.11.2006 | MC | 30.11.2006 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/37] | FI | 19.04.2006 | |
IE | 19.04.2006 | ||
TR | 19.04.2006 | ||
DK | 19.07.2006 | ||
SE | 19.07.2006 | ||
GR | 20.07.2006 | ||
PT | 19.09.2006 | ||
AT | 26.11.2006 | ||
LU | 26.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
Former [2008/19] | FI | 19.04.2006 | |
IE | 19.04.2006 | ||
DK | 19.07.2006 | ||
SE | 19.07.2006 | ||
GR | 20.07.2006 | ||
PT | 19.09.2006 | ||
AT | 26.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
Former [2008/13] | FI | 19.04.2006 | |
IE | 19.04.2006 | ||
DK | 19.07.2006 | ||
SE | 19.07.2006 | ||
PT | 19.09.2006 | ||
AT | 26.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/50] | FI | 19.04.2006 | |
IE | 19.04.2006 | ||
DK | 19.07.2006 | ||
SE | 19.07.2006 | ||
PT | 19.09.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/37] | FI | 19.04.2006 | |
IE | 19.04.2006 | ||
IT | 19.04.2006 | ||
DK | 19.07.2006 | ||
SE | 19.07.2006 | ||
PT | 19.09.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/36] | FI | 19.04.2006 | |
IE | 19.04.2006 | ||
IT | 19.04.2006 | ||
DK | 19.07.2006 | ||
SE | 19.07.2006 | ||
PT | 19.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/12] | FI | 19.04.2006 | |
IE | 19.04.2006 | ||
DK | 19.07.2006 | ||
SE | 19.07.2006 | ||
PT | 19.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/09] | FI | 19.04.2006 | |
DK | 19.07.2006 | ||
SE | 19.07.2006 | ||
PT | 19.09.2006 | ||
Former [2006/51] | FI | 19.04.2006 | |
SE | 19.07.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | SE | 19.07.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH05214062 ; | [A]US4098772 (BONK HENRY W, et al) [A] 1-3,6,7 * column 1, line 14 - column 2, line 35 * * column 5, line 11 - line 65 * * examples B,C,L,M; tables I,IV *; | [A]DE3132760 (BASF AG [DE]) [A] 1-4,6,7 * page 2, line 4 - page 5, line 19 * * page 10, line 25 - page 12, line 24 * * examples 1,3,5 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19931207), vol. 017, no. 659, Database accession no. (C - 1137), & JP05214062 A 19930824 (TOYOBO CO LTD) [A] 1,6,7 * abstract * |