EP1209668 - Magnetic transferring method, and method and apparatus for cleaning magnetic transfer master medium [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.11.2010 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.11.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.12.2010 [2010/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/11] | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2002/22] | For all designated states FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD. 210 Nakanuma Minami-Ashigara-shi Kanagawa 250-01 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nishikawa, Masakazu Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd., 12-1 Oogi-cho 2-chome Odawara-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 02 /
Nagao, Makoto Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd., 12-1 Oogi-cho 2-chome Odawara-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | [2002/22] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/22] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01127476.8 | 28.11.2001 | [2002/22] | Priority number, date | JP20000360464 | 28.11.2000 Original published format: JP 2000360464 | JP20000361212 | 28.11.2000 Original published format: JP 2000361212 | JP20000378519 | 13.12.2000 Original published format: JP 2000378519 | [2002/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1209668 | Date: | 29.05.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1209668 | Date: | 22.08.2007 | [2007/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.07.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G11B5/86, G11B23/50, // G11B5/596 | [2002/22] | CPC: |
G11B5/865 (EP,US);
G11B5/86 (KR);
G11B23/505 (EP,US);
G11B5/596 (EP,US);
G11B5/84 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/18] |
Former [2002/22] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Magnetische Übertragungsmethode und Reinigungsmethode und -gerät eines Mastermediums für magnetische Ubertragung | [2002/22] | English: | Magnetic transferring method, and method and apparatus for cleaning magnetic transfer master medium | [2002/22] | French: | Méthode de transfert magnétique et méthode et appareil pour le nettoyage de milieu maître de transfert magnétique | [2002/22] | Examination procedure | 21.11.2007 | Examination requested [2008/01] | 26.02.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 01.04.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | 25.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/49] | 22.07.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2009 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3843964 (FUJIMOTO S) [A] 7 * the whole document *; | [A]US4633351 (BARDOS ANDREW M [US], et al) [A] * column 2, line 37 - column 3, line 28 *; | [A]GB2280983 (FARROW ROBERT IRVING [US], et al) [A] * the whole document *; | [YA]US5663127 (FLYNN RICHARD M [US], et al) [Y] 2 * column 3, line 6 - column 17 * * column 10, line 55 - line 64 * [A] 3-5; | [A]US5669979 (ELLIOTT DAVID J [US], et al) [A] 7,8 * column 12, line 47 - line 53; figure 6 *; | [A]FR2751128 (COMMISSARIAT ENERGIE ATOMIQUE [FR]) [A] 7,8 * the whole document *; | [A]JPH11296849 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 8 * the whole document *; | [XAY]US5991104 (BONYHARD PETER I [US]) [X] 1 * column 9, line 39 - line 61; figure 8; claims 12,30 * [A] 3-6 [Y] 2; | [A]US6096694 (TEI YOUICHI [JP], et al) [A] * the whole document *; | [A]WO0065580 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 7 * the whole document * | Examination | NL1012035 | US6352656 |