EP1209325 - Steam cooling apparatus for gas turbine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.12.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.2008 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 24.12.2008 [2008/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES, LTD. 5-1, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [2007/07] |
Former [2002/22] | For all designated states Mitsubishi Heavy Industries, Ltd. 5-1, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tanaka, Tomoka c/o MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES, LTD. Takasago-shi, Hyogo / JP | 02 /
Hiramoto, Koji c/o MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES, LTD. Takasago-shi, Hyogo / JP | 03 /
Kita, Yoshiyuki c/o MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES, LTD. Takasago-shi, Hyogo / JP | [2002/42] |
Former [2002/22] | 01 /
Tanaka, Tomoka, Takasago Machinery Works Mitsubishi Heavy Industries, Ltd., 1-1, Arai-cho Shinhama 2-chome, Takasago-shi, Hyogo / JP | ||
02 /
Hiramoto, Koji, Takasago Machinery Works Mitsubishi Heavy Industries, Ltd., 1-1, Arai-cho Shinhama 2-chome, Takasago-shi, Hyogo / JP | |||
03 /
Kita, Yoshiyuki, Takasago Machinery Works Mitsubishi Heavy Industries, Ltd., 1-1, Arai-cho Shinhama 2-chome, Takasago-shi, Hyogo / JP | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/22] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01127481.8 | 28.11.2001 | [2002/22] | Priority number, date | JP20000360799 | 28.11.2000 Original published format: JP 2000360799 | JP20000360800 | 28.11.2000 Original published format: JP 2000360800 | [2002/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1209325 | Date: | 29.05.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1209325 | Date: | 29.10.2003 | [2003/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1209325 | Date: | 14.02.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.09.2003 | Classification | IPC: | F01K23/10, F02C7/18 | [2002/22] | CPC: |
F01K23/108 (EP,US);
F02C7/16 (EP,US);
F05D2260/2322 (EP,US);
Y02E20/16 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [2004/30] |
Former [2002/22] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Dampfkühlungsvorrichtung für eine Gasturbine | [2002/22] | English: | Steam cooling apparatus for gas turbine | [2002/22] | French: | Dispositif de refroidissement à vapeur pour une turbine à gaz | [2002/22] | Examination procedure | 28.11.2001 | Examination requested [2002/22] | 12.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.04.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 17.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.09.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.12.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 22.12.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.11.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 14.02.2007 | FR | 14.02.2007 | IT | 14.02.2007 | LI | 14.02.2007 | [2008/52] |
Former [2008/23] | CH | 14.02.2007 | |
IT | 14.02.2007 | ||
LI | 14.02.2007 | ||
FR | 05.10.2007 | ||
Former [2007/37] | CH | 14.02.2007 | |
LI | 14.02.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH10299509 ; | [A]EP0928882 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]); | [XA]EP0933505 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]) [X] 3 * column 1, line 31 - column 2, line 15; figure - * [A] 1,4,9,10; | [XA]EP0942152 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]) [X] 3 * column 5, line 9 - line 45 * * column 8, line 28 - column 9, line 5; figure - * [A] 1,4,9,10; | [XP]EP1148210 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]) [XP] 1,2,5-7,9,10 * figure 1 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990226), vol. 1999, no. 02, & JP10299509 A 19981110 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [X] 3 * abstract * |