EP1207674 - Method, computer system and computer program for managing incoming and outgoing communications processes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.01.2005 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.01.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.03.2005 [2005/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INCAS AG Europark-Fichtenhain A 15 47807 Krefeld / DE | [2002/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Janke, Roland Friedrich-Kramer-Strasse 19 47906 Kempen / DE | [2002/21] | Representative(s) | Cohausz & Florack Patent- & Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Bleichstrasse 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/21] | Cohausz & Florack Patentanwälte Kanzlerstrasse 8a 40472 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 01127676.3 | 20.11.2001 | [2002/21] | Priority number, date | DE2000157530 | 20.11.2000 Original published format: DE 10057530 | [2002/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1207674 | Date: | 22.05.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1207674 | Date: | 19.11.2003 | [2003/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.10.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04M3/51, H04M7/00, G06F17/30, H04L29/06 | [2003/31] | CPC: |
H04M3/523 (EP);
H04M7/006 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2002/21] | H04M3/51, H04M7/00 | Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2004/33] |
Former [2002/21] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren, EDV-System und Computerprogramm zur Verwaltung von eingehenden und ausgehenden Kommunikationsprozessen | [2002/21] | English: | Method, computer system and computer program for managing incoming and outgoing communications processes | [2002/21] | French: | Méthode, système informatique et programme d'ordinateur pour la gestion de processus de communications entrants et sortants | [2002/21] | Examination procedure | 20.05.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/11] | 29.09.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2005/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 09.07.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 09.07.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 09.07.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 09.07.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 09.07.2004 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 09.07.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 09.07.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 09.07.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 09.07.2004 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 09.07.2004 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 09.07.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 09.07.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 09.07.2004 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 09.07.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 09.07.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 09.07.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 09.07.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 09.07.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 09.07.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 09.07.2004 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2004 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9926153 (STELLAR COMPUTING [US]) [X] 1-3,7-19 * abstract * * page 1, line 30 - page 2, line 4 * * page 3, line 1 - page 5, line 30 * * page 6 * * page 7, lines 14-27 * * page 12 * * page 24 * * page 31, lines 8-19 * * page 36, lines 30-40 * * figures 1-8 *; | [X]GB2337400 (IBM [US]) [X] 4-19 * the whole document *; | [A]US5991394 (DEZONNO ANTHONY J [US], et al) [A] 4-19 * column A * * column 1, lines 8-19 * * column 2, lines 16-67 * * column 4, lines 7-16 * * column 4, lines 27-50 * * column 5, lines 11-56 * * figure 1 *; | [A]WO0049794 (ECI TELECOM LTD [IL]) [A] 1-3,7-19 * abstract * * page 1, line 10 - page 2, line 20 * * page 5, line 30 - page 6, line 19 * * page 8, line 19 - page 9, line 14 * * page 10, line 12 - page 14, line 26 * * figures 2A,2B *; | [A]US6122364 (PETRUNKA ROBERT W [US], et al) [A] 1-3,7-19 * the whole document * | [XA] - BROCKBANK R ET AL, "COMPUTER TELEPHONY INTEGRATION AND JAVA", BRITISH TELECOMMUNICATIONS ENGINEERING, BRITISH TELECOMMUNICATIONS ENGINEERING. LONDON, GB, (19980401), vol. 17, no. 1, ISSN 0262-401X, pages 10 - 17, XP000765544 [X] 1-3,7,8,11-19 * page 2, column R, line 40 - page 3, column M, line 39 * * page 3, column R, line 46 - page 7, column R, line 8 * [A] 9,10,16 |