EP1217512 - Arithmetic circuit and arithmetic method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.06.2010 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 26.10.2011 [2011/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2009/34] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | ||
Former [2002/26] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takano, Kohji, IBM United Kingdom Ltd. Intellectual Property Law, Hursley Park Winchester, Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | 02 /
Satoh, Akashi, IBM United Kingdom Ltd. Intellectual Property Law, Hursley Park Winchester, Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | [2002/26] | Representative(s) | Ling, Christopher John IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/26] | Ling, Christopher John IBM United Kingdom Limited, Intellectual Property Department, Hursley Park Winchester, Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | Application number, filing date | 01128119.3 | 27.11.2001 | [2002/26] | Priority number, date | JP20000386069 | 19.12.2000 Original published format: JP 2000386069 | [2002/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1217512 | Date: | 26.06.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1217512 | Date: | 05.03.2008 | [2008/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1217512 | Date: | 19.08.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.02.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G06F7/72, G06F9/302, G06F9/38 | [2008/48] | CPC: |
G06F9/3824 (EP,US);
G06F7/44 (KR);
G06F7/728 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2002/26] | G06F9/302, G06F9/38, // G06F7/72 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/26] | Title | German: | Arithmetische Schaltung und arithmetisches Verfahren | [2002/26] | English: | Arithmetic circuit and arithmetic method | [2002/26] | French: | Circuit arithmétique et procédé arithmétique | [2002/26] | Examination procedure | 02.09.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.09.2008 | Examination requested [2008/42] | 12.11.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.02.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 05.02.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Opposition(s) | 20.05.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 17.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 19.08.2009 | BE | 19.08.2009 | CY | 19.08.2009 | DK | 19.08.2009 | FI | 19.08.2009 | IT | 19.08.2009 | NL | 19.08.2009 | SE | 19.08.2009 | TR | 19.08.2009 | GR | 20.11.2009 | IE | 27.11.2009 | LU | 27.11.2009 | CH | 30.11.2009 | ES | 30.11.2009 | LI | 30.11.2009 | MC | 30.11.2009 | PT | 21.12.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/21] | AT | 19.08.2009 | |
BE | 19.08.2009 | ||
CY | 19.08.2009 | ||
DK | 19.08.2009 | ||
FI | 19.08.2009 | ||
IT | 19.08.2009 | ||
NL | 19.08.2009 | ||
SE | 19.08.2009 | ||
GR | 20.11.2009 | ||
IE | 27.11.2009 | ||
LU | 27.11.2009 | ||
CH | 30.11.2009 | ||
ES | 30.11.2009 | ||
LI | 30.11.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
PT | 21.12.2009 | ||
Former [2011/14] | AT | 19.08.2009 | |
BE | 19.08.2009 | ||
CY | 19.08.2009 | ||
DK | 19.08.2009 | ||
FI | 19.08.2009 | ||
IT | 19.08.2009 | ||
NL | 19.08.2009 | ||
SE | 19.08.2009 | ||
GR | 20.11.2009 | ||
IE | 27.11.2009 | ||
CH | 30.11.2009 | ||
ES | 30.11.2009 | ||
LI | 30.11.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
PT | 21.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/46] | AT | 19.08.2009 | |
BE | 19.08.2009 | ||
CY | 19.08.2009 | ||
DK | 19.08.2009 | ||
FI | 19.08.2009 | ||
NL | 19.08.2009 | ||
SE | 19.08.2009 | ||
GR | 20.11.2009 | ||
IE | 27.11.2009 | ||
CH | 30.11.2009 | ||
ES | 30.11.2009 | ||
LI | 30.11.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
PT | 21.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/30] | AT | 19.08.2009 | |
BE | 19.08.2009 | ||
CY | 19.08.2009 | ||
DK | 19.08.2009 | ||
FI | 19.08.2009 | ||
NL | 19.08.2009 | ||
SE | 19.08.2009 | ||
ES | 30.11.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
PT | 21.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/28] | AT | 19.08.2009 | |
BE | 19.08.2009 | ||
CY | 19.08.2009 | ||
DK | 19.08.2009 | ||
FI | 19.08.2009 | ||
NL | 19.08.2009 | ||
SE | 19.08.2009 | ||
ES | 30.11.2009 | ||
PT | 21.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/20] | AT | 19.08.2009 | |
CY | 19.08.2009 | ||
DK | 19.08.2009 | ||
FI | 19.08.2009 | ||
NL | 19.08.2009 | ||
SE | 19.08.2009 | ||
ES | 30.11.2009 | ||
PT | 21.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/16] | AT | 19.08.2009 | |
CY | 19.08.2009 | ||
FI | 19.08.2009 | ||
NL | 19.08.2009 | ||
SE | 19.08.2009 | ||
ES | 30.11.2009 | ||
PT | 21.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/10] | AT | 19.08.2009 | |
FI | 19.08.2009 | ||
NL | 19.08.2009 | ||
SE | 19.08.2009 | ||
ES | 30.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/09] | AT | 19.08.2009 | |
FI | 19.08.2009 | ||
SE | 19.08.2009 | ||
ES | 30.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/08] | AT | 19.08.2009 | |
SE | 19.08.2009 | ||
ES | 30.11.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2318890 (MOTOROLA LTD [GB]) [X] 1-13 * page 5 - page 18 *; | [X]WO9927437 (ATMEL CORP [US]) [X] 1-13 * page 25, line 17 - line 36; figure 9 * * page 31, line 25 - page 39, line 21 *; | [X]EP0947914 (RAINBOW TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [X] 1-13 * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0046]; figure 11 *; | [X] - DENG YULIANG ET AL, "Implementation of RSA cryptoprocessor based on Montgomery algorithm", SOLID-STATE AND INTEGRATED CIRCUIT TECHNOLOGY, 1998. PROCEEDINGS. 1998 5TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON BEIJING, CHINA 21-23 OCT. 1998, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, US, (19981021), ISBN 0-7803-4306-9, pages 524 - 526, XP010347090 [X] 1-13 * paragraph [03.2] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICSICT.1998.785937 | by applicant | GB2318890 | WO9927437 | EP0947914 |