EP1213259 - Process for manufacturing micromechanical and microoptomechanical structures with single crystal silicon exposure step [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.03.2008 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.04.2008 [2008/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MICROSCAN SYSTEMS INCORPORATED 1201 SW 7th Street Renton Washington 98055 / US | For all designated states Xerox Corporation 800 Long Ridge Rd., P.O. Box 1600 Stamford, CT 06904-1600 / US | [2007/21] |
Former [2002/24] | For all designated states MICROSCAN SYSTEMS INCORPORATED 1201 SW 7th Street Renton, Washington 98055 / US | ||
For all designated states XEROX CORPORATION 800 Long Ridge Rd., P.O. Box 1600 Stamford, CT 06904-1600 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zosel, Andrew J. 19234 SE 259th Place Covington, Washington 98042 / US | 02 /
Gulvin, Peter M. 11 Green Pine Lane Webster, New York 14580 / US | 03 /
Chen, Jingkuang 100 Brittany Circle Rochster, New York 14618 / US | 04 /
Kubby, Joel A. 63 Spring Valley Drive Rochester, New York 14622 / US | 05 /
Lin, Chuang-Chia 3400 Richmond Parkway, Apt. 1321 San Pablo, California 94806 / US | 06 /
Tran, Alex T. 2250 N. Triphammer Road, Apt. K2A Ithaca, New York 14850 / US | [2002/24] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/24] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01128161.5 | 27.11.2001 | [2002/24] | Priority number, date | US20000724514 | 27.11.2000 Original published format: US 724514 | [2002/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1213259 | Date: | 12.06.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1213259 | Date: | 16.06.2004 | [2004/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1213259 | Date: | 23.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.05.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B81B3/00 | [2002/24] | CPC: |
B81C1/00666 (EP,US);
G02B26/0833 (EP,US);
B81B2203/058 (EP,US);
B81C2201/014 (EP,US);
B81C2201/0164 (EP,US);
B81C2201/056 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/10] |
Former [2002/24] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von mikromechanischen und mikrooptomechanischen Strukturen mit Freilegen von einkristallinem Silizium | [2006/50] | English: | Process for manufacturing micromechanical and microoptomechanical structures with single crystal silicon exposure step | [2002/24] | French: | Procédé de fabrication de structures micromécaniques et microoptomecaniques avec un étage d'exposition de silicium monocristallin | [2002/24] |
Former [2002/24] | Verfahren zur Herstellung von mikromechanischen und mikrooptomechanischen Strukturen mit einem Schritt von Belichtung von Silizium-Einkristall | Examination procedure | 30.10.2003 | Examination requested [2004/01] | 14.01.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.05.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 23.03.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.11.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.04.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 04.04.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.02.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY] - J. KUBBY, "Micro-Opto-Electromechanical Systems Manufacturing", PUBLIC PRESENTATION AT 1999 ADVANCED TECHNOLOGY PROGRAM NATIONAL MEETING, SAN JOSÉ, USA, (19991115), URL: www.atp.nist.gov/1999national/kubby.pdf, (20040311), XP002273953 [X] 1-16,22 * slides "SCS-SMM Process I & II", "Milestones", "Mask Set 1 Unit Process Development" * [Y] 17-21 | [Y] - BROSNIHAN T J ET AL, Embedded interconnect and electrical isolation for high-aspect-ratio, SOI inertial instruments, 1997 INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON SOLID-STATE SENSORS AND ACTUATORS. DIGEST OF TECHNICAL PAPERS. TRANSDUCERS 97. CHICAGO, IL, JUNE 16 - 19, 1997. SESSIONS 1A1 - 2D3. PAPERS NO. 1A1.01 - 2D3.14PL, INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON SOLID-STATE SENSORS AND ACT, ISBN 0-7803-3829-4, XP002108481 [Y] 17-21 * paragraph "Summary" * * paragraph "Isolation and interconnect fabrication" * * figures 1,2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/SENSOR.1997.613732 | [YA] - ZIMMERMANN L ET AL, "AIRBAG APPLICATION: A MICROSYSTEM INCLUDING A SILICON CAPACITIVE ACCELEROMETER, CMOS SWITCHED CAPACITOR ELECTRONICS AND TRUE SELF-TEST CAPABILITY", SENSORS AND ACTUATORS A, ELSEVIER SEQUOIA S.A., LAUSANNE, CH, (1995), vol. A46, no. 1/3, ISSN 0924-4247, pages 190 - 195, XP000514197 [Y] 1-4,12-15 * paragraph "3. Fabrication process" * * figure 1 * [A] 11,22 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0924-4247(94)00888-O | [Y] - PISTER K S J, "MICROFABRICATED HINGES", SENSORS AND ACTUATORS A, ELSEVIER SEQUOIA S.A., LAUSANNE, CH, (19920601), vol. A33, no. 3, ISSN 0924-4247, pages 249 - 256, XP000297416 [Y] 1-4,12-15 * paragraph "2. Process" *;; figures 2,3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0924-4247(92)80172-Y | Examination | US6002507 |