EP1213728 - Current-limiting device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.11.2006 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.11.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.12.2006 [2006/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eaton Corporation Eaton Center Cleveland Ohio 44114-2584 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/24] | For all designated states EATON CORPORATION Eaton Center Cleveland, Ohio 44114-2584 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hanna, William K. 366 Bailey Avenue Pittsburgh, PA 15211 / US | 02 /
Miller, Jeffery A. 1902 Cliff Street Coraopolis, PA 15108 / US | 03 /
Shea, John J. 309 Highland Pines Drive Pittsburgh, PA 15237 / US | 04 /
Mrenna, Stephen Albert 240 Sebring Road Beaver, Pennsylvania 15009 / US | [2002/24] | Representative(s) | Geyer, Ulrich F. Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/24] | Geyer, Ulrich F., Dr. Dipl.-Phys. WAGNER & GEYER, Patentanwälte, Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01128172.2 | 27.11.2001 | [2002/24] | Priority number, date | US20000723364 | 27.11.2000 Original published format: US 723364 | [2002/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1213728 | Date: | 12.06.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1213728 | Date: | 26.10.2005 | [2005/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H01C7/02, H01C7/13 | [2002/24] | CPC: |
H01C7/13 (EP);
H01C7/028 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | [2006/27] |
Former [2002/24] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Strombegrenzungseinrichtung | [2002/24] | English: | Current-limiting device | [2002/24] | French: | Dispositif de limitation de courant | [2002/24] | Examination procedure | 01.12.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/50] | 31.07.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2006/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 02.06.2006 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 02.06.2006 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 02.06.2006 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 02.06.2006 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 02.06.2006 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2005 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4331861 (MEIXNER HANS) [A] 1-7,15-25* the whole document *; | [XY]US4698614 (WELCH RICHARD E [US], et al) [X] 1,1 * column 5, lines 30-60; figure 9 * * figures 4,6 * [Y] 2-6,15-25; | [AY]EP0487920 (ASEA BROWN BOVERI [SE]) [A] 1,1-3,15-17,20,22-25 * figures 2-4; claims 2,4 * * the whole document * [Y] 4-7,18,19,21; | [A]US5565826 (KARLSTROEM PER OLOF [SE]) [A] 1-7,15-25 * the whole document *; | [A]US5644283 (GROSSE-WILDE HUBERT [DE], et al) [A] 1-7,15-25 * figure 4; claims 1,10,22,23 *; | [Y]EP0853322 (EATON CORP [US]) [Y] 1,2,15-17,1-7,18-25 * pages 12,20; figures 1,2 * * the whole document * * figure 1; claims 19-21 * |