EP1187358 - Spread spectrum communication device and spread spectrum communication method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.08.2005 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 09.07.2008 [2008/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/11] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yano, Yasuhiro, Mitsubishi Denki Kabushiki Kaisha 2-3 Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 02 /
Murai, Hideshi, Mitsubishi Denki Kabushiki Kaisha 2-3 Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2002/11] | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 11a 80339 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/28] | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 13 80339 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/11] | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR Mozartstrasse 17 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01128185.4 | 05.03.1999 | [2002/11] | Priority number, date | JP19980080031 | 26.03.1998 Original published format: JP 8003198 | [2002/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1187358 | Date: | 13.03.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1187358 | Date: | 21.05.2003 | [2003/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1187358 | Date: | 13.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/42] | Type: | B9 Corrected patent specification | No.: | EP1187358 | Date: | 27.04.2005 | [2005/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.04.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/707, H04B7/26, H04B7/005, // H04Q7/38 | [2003/21] | CPC: |
H04B1/7087 (EP,US);
H04W28/06 (KR);
G08C15/00 (EP,US);
H04B1/707 (EP,US);
H04B1/70735 (EP,US);
H04B7/2628 (EP,US);
H04J13/00 (EP,US);
H04J13/10 (KR);
H04L1/0001 (EP,US);
H04L1/0003 (EP,US);
H04L1/0009 (EP,US);
H04L1/0025 (EP,US);
H04L1/0042 (EP,US);
H04L1/0047 (EP,US);
H04L1/0056 (EP,US);
H04L1/0071 (EP,US);
H04L1/0083 (EP,US);
H04W52/08 (EP,US);
H04W52/267 (EP,US);
H04W52/28 (EP,US);
H04W52/287 (EP,US);
H04W52/288 (EP,US);
H04W52/36 (EP,US);
H04W52/362 (EP,US);
H04W52/367 (EP,US);
H04W52/48 (EP,US);
H04W52/56 (EP,US);
H04W52/60 (EP,US);
H04B1/7075 (EP,US);
H04B1/7083 (EP,US);
H04B2201/70703 (EP,US);
H04B7/2668 (EP,US);
H04L1/0026 (EP,US);
H04L1/004 (EP,US);
H04W36/0088 (EP,US);
H04W36/302 (EP,KR);
|
Former IPC [2002/11] | H04B1/707, H04B7/26 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FI, FR, GB, IT, PT, SE [2002/11] | Title | German: | Spreizspektrumkommunikationsgerät und -verfahren | [2002/11] | English: | Spread spectrum communication device and spread spectrum communication method | [2002/11] | French: | Dispositif et procédé de communication à spectre étalé | [2002/11] | Examination procedure | 31.10.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.11.2003 | Examination requested [2004/02] | 09.02.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.06.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 04.06.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP99907868.6 / EP0984581 | Divisional application(s) | EP04013246.6 / EP1460774 | EP05015438.4 / EP1612960 | EP06008654.3 / EP1689089 | EP06008655.0 / EP1699141 | EP07011901.1 / EP1830475 | EP07011902.9 / EP1830476 | EP07011903.7 / EP1830477 | EP07011904.5 / EP1830478 | EP08001784.1 / EP1921759 | EP08001785.8 / EP1912342 | EP08001786.6 / EP1921760 | EP08001787.4 / EP1921761 | EP08001788.2 / EP1921762 | EP08001789.0 / EP1921763 | EP08001790.8 / EP1921764 | EP08001791.6 / EP1921765 | EP08001792.4 / EP1921766 | EP08001793.2 / EP1921767 | EP08001794.0 / EP1921768 | EP08001795.7 / EP1921769 | Opposition(s) | 14.07.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9623369 (MOTOROLA LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-6 * abstract * * page 5, line 19 - line 20; figures 1,4 *; | [AD]WO9740592 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [AD] 1-6 * page 8, line 7 - line 12 * * page 10, line 18 - line 23 ** figures 2A,2B *; | [AD] - GUSTAFSSON M ET AL, "Compressed Mode Techniques for Inter-Frequency Measurements in a Wide-band DS-CDMA System", WAVES OF THE YEAR 2000+ PIMRC. THE IEEE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON PERSONAL, INDOOR AND MOBILE RADIO COMMUNICATIONS. TECHNICAL PROGRAM, XX, XX, (19970901), vol. 1, pages 231 - 235, XP002127494 [AD] 1-6 * page 232, paragraph II * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/PIMRC.1997.624398 |