EP1225729 - Multi-service network switch with quality of access [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.01.2009 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.01.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.02.2009 [2009/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alcatel Internetworking, Inc. 26801 W. Agoura Road Calabasas, CA 91301 / US | [2002/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schunk, Richard 64 King Street Norfolk, MA 02056 / US | 02 /
Young, Desmond 23050 Old Logging Road Los Gatos Mountains, CA 95033 / US | [2002/30] | Representative(s) | DREISS Patentanwälte PartG mbB Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/30] | Dreiss, Fuhlendorf, Steimle & Becker Patentanwälte, Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 01128309.0 | 23.02.2000 | [2002/30] | Priority number, date | US19990121270P | 23.02.1999 Original published format: US 121270 P | US19990121271P | 23.02.1999 Original published format: US 121271 P | US19990121272P | 23.02.1999 Original published format: US 121272 P | US19990121273P | 23.02.1999 Original published format: US 121273 P | US19990121274P | 23.02.1999 Original published format: US 121274 P | US19990121275P | 23.02.1999 Original published format: US 121275 P | US19990121276P | 23.02.1999 Original published format: US 121276 P | US19990121277P | 23.02.1999 Original published format: US 121277 P | US19990121278P | 23.02.1999 Original published format: US 121278 P | US19990121279P | 23.02.1999 Original published format: US 121279 P | US19990121589P | 23.02.1999 Original published format: US 121589 P | US19990121590P | 23.02.1999 Original published format: US 121590 P | US19990121591P | 23.02.1999 Original published format: US 121591 P | US19990121592P | 23.02.1999 Original published format: US 121592 P | US19990121593P | 23.02.1999 Original published format: US 121593 P | [2002/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1225729 | Date: | 24.07.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1225729 | Date: | 28.08.2002 | [2002/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.07.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/44, H04L12/46, H04L12/56, H04L29/14 | [2002/33] | CPC: |
H04L49/354 (EP,US);
H04L43/00 (EP);
H04L43/0811 (EP);
H04L45/10 (EP);
H04L45/122 (EP);
H04L45/28 (EP);
H04L45/302 (EP);
H04L45/308 (EP);
H04L45/583 (EP);
H04L47/20 (EP);
H04L47/24 (EP);
H04L49/20 (EP);
H04L41/0659 (EP,US);
H04L41/5003 (EP);
H04L43/0817 (EP);
H04L43/16 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2002/30] | H04L12/44, H04L12/46, H04L12/56 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/30] | Title | German: | Mehrdienstnetzwerkvermittlung mit Zugriffsqualität | [2002/30] | English: | Multi-service network switch with quality of access | [2002/30] | French: | Autocommutateur multiservice avec qualité d'accès | [2002/30] | Examination procedure | 29.11.2001 | Examination requested [2002/30] | 30.09.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.03.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.01.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.09.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/09] | 08.10.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2009/09] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP00919337.6 / EP1171976 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2008 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5550816 (HARDWICK KEN [US], et al); | [A]WO9839879 (NORTHERN TELECOM LTD [CA]); | [XY]US5852655 (MCHALE JOHN F [US], et al) |