EP1221788 - Device and method for collecting traffic information [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.04.2009 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.05.2009 [2009/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/24] | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | ||
Former [2002/28] | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nakamichi, Koji, Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 02 /
Takashima, Kenya, Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 03 /
Soumiya, Toshio, Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2002/28] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/28] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01128450.2 | 05.12.2001 | [2002/28] | Priority number, date | JP20000400634 | 28.12.2000 Original published format: JP 2000400634 | [2002/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1221788 | Date: | 10.07.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/28] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1221788 | Date: | 22.03.2006 | [2006/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1221788 | Date: | 11.06.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.02.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/26, H04L12/56 | [2002/28] | CPC: |
H04L47/10 (EP,US);
H04L43/00 (EP,US);
H04L47/11 (EP,US);
H04L47/125 (EP,US);
H04L43/0829 (EP,US);
H04L43/0882 (EP,US);
H04L43/12 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/48] |
Former [2002/28] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Sammeln von Datenverkehrsinformationen | [2002/28] | English: | Device and method for collecting traffic information | [2002/28] | French: | Appareil et procédé pour collecter des informations de traffic de données | [2002/28] | Examination procedure | 29.08.2006 | Examination requested [2006/41] | 26.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.04.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 21.04.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 21.04.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.03.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/21] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 21.04.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 21.04.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 05.05.2008 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1035751 (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [X] 1-20 * page 5, paragraph 23 - page 13, paragraph 74; figures 1,2,5-7 *; | [Y] - C-Y LEE A CELER N GAMMAGE S GHANTI NORTEL NETWORKS GERALD ASH AT & T, "Distributed Route Exchangers", IETF STANDARD-WORKING-DRAFT, INTERNET ENGINEERING TASK FORCE, IETF, CH, (200011), ISSN 0000-0004, XP015031474 [Y] 1-20 * abstract * * page 2 - page 4 * * page 7 - page 8 * | [Y] - NORIHITO FUJITA ATSUSHI IWATA NEC CORPORATION, "Traffic Engineering Extensions to OSPF Summary LSA", IETF STANDARD-WORKING-DRAFT, INTERNET ENGINEERING TASK FORCE, IETF, CH, (200003), ISSN 0000-0004, XP015013408 [Y] 1-20 * the whole document * |