EP1215461 - Improved tube for use in serpentine heat exchanger [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.09.2003 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Modine Manufacturing Company 1500 DeKoven Avenue Racine Wisconsin 53403 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/25] | For all designated states Modine Manufacturing Company 1500 DeKoven Avenue Racine Wisconsin 53403 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Swiger, J. Darin 733 Cottonwood Circle Genoa, Illinois 60135 / US | 02 /
DeRosia, Andrew J. 10415 Forest Hills Road Racine, Wisconsin 53108 / US | [2002/25] | Representative(s) | Heselberger, Johannes Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Heselberger, Johannes Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle - Pagenberg - Dost Altenburg - Geissler Galileiplatz 1 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/25] | Heselberger, Johannes Bardehle - Pagenberg - Dost - Altenburg - Geissler - Isenbruck, Galileiplatz 1 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01128497.3 | 07.12.2001 | [2002/25] | Priority number, date | US20000737253 | 13.12.2000 Original published format: US 737253 | [2002/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1215461 | Date: | 19.06.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1215461 | Date: | 07.08.2002 | [2002/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.06.2002 | Classification | IPC: | F28F1/12, F28F3/02, F28F1/02 | [2002/25] | CPC: |
F28D1/05383 (EP,US);
F28F1/30 (KR);
F28F1/022 (EP,US);
F28F1/126 (EP,US);
F28F2265/32 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49377 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49391 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/18] |
Former [2002/25] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verbessertes Rohr für einen schlangenförmigen Wärmetauscher | [2002/25] | English: | Improved tube for use in serpentine heat exchanger | [2002/25] | French: | Tube amélioré pour échangeur de chaleur à serpentin | [2002/25] | Examination procedure | 11.02.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/46] | 04.06.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2003/46] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4653580 (STEELE LUTHER R [US]) [A] 1-24 * column 2, line 10 - line 36; figure 3 *; | [A]DE4026988 (BEHR GMBH & CO [DE]) [A] 1-24 * column 1, line 64 - column 4, line 60; figures 1-4 *; | [X]FR2709816 (VALEO THERMIQUE MOTEUR SA [FR]) [X] 1-24 * page 6, line 27 - page 9, line 35; figures 1-9 *; | [A]US5867904 (HARRIS MATTHEW K [US], et al) |