EP1316732 - Fluid-actuated working device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.07.2005 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.08.2005 [2005/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Festo AG & Co. Ruiter Strasse 82 73734 Esslingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/23] | For all designated states Festo AG & Co Ruiter Strasse 82 73734 Esslingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Muth, Andreas, Dr. Fasanenweg 21/1 73230 Kirchheim / DE | 02 /
Haajo, Jari Rautatienkatu 25 33100 Tampere / FI | [2003/23] | Representative(s) | Abel, Martin, et al Patentanwälte Magenbauer, Reimold, Vetter & Abel Plochinger Strasse 109 73730 Esslingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/23] | Abel, Martin, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Magenbauer, Reimold, Vetter & Abel Plochinger Strasse 109 73730 Esslingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 01128503.8 | 29.11.2001 | [2003/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1316732 | Date: | 04.06.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1316732 | Date: | 08.09.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.07.2002 | Classification | IPC: | F15B13/00 | [2003/23] | CPC: |
F15B15/202 (EP,US);
F15B11/006 (EP,US);
F15B13/0405 (EP,US);
F15B2013/006 (EP,US);
F15B2211/30575 (EP,US);
F15B2211/31588 (EP,US);
F15B2211/327 (EP,US);
F15B2211/6313 (EP,US);
F15B2211/71 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FI, FR, GB, IT [2004/09] |
Former [2003/23] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Fluidbetätigte Arbeitsvorrichtung | [2003/23] | English: | Fluid-actuated working device | [2003/23] | French: | Dispositif de travail actionné par un fluide | [2003/23] | Examination procedure | 23.07.2002 | Examination requested [2003/23] | 10.10.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.01.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.04.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.07.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 16.07.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.12.2003 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 30.03.2004 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Opposition(s) | 09.06.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 13.01.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 13.01.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 13.01.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 13.01.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 13.01.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 13.01.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 13.01.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 13.01.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 13.01.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 13.01.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 13.01.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 13.01.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 13.01.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 13.01.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AY]JPH0510308 ; | [AY]FR2545161 (FESTO MASCHF STOLL G [DE]) [A] 1 * page 3, line 29 - page 4, line 26; figures 1,2,5 * [Y] 17; | [DXY]EP0955473 (FESTO AG & CO [DE]) [DX] 1-4,6,7,13,16,18,19 * the whole document * [Y] 11,14,17,20; | [AY]EP1059458 (FESTO AG & CO [DE]) [A] 1 * column 4, line 8 - line 29; figure 1 * [Y] 14,20; | [A]WO0177534 (FESTO AG & CO [DE], et al) [A] 1 * abstract * | [AY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930531), vol. 017, no. 282, Database accession no. (M - 1420), & JP05010308 A 19930119 (SMC CORP) [A] 1 * abstract * [Y] 11 | by applicant | WO9958859 | DE20105448U |