EP1235424 - Method for recording and displaying fluorescence images with high resolution [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 03.08.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2019 | Change - classification | published on 13.02.2019 [2019/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Carl Zeiss Microscopy GmbH Carl-Zeiss-Promenade 10 07745 Jena / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/48] | For all designated states Carl Zeiss Microscopy GmbH Carl-Zeiss-Promenade 10 07745 Jena / DE | ||
Former [2011/08] | For all designated states Carl Zeiss AG Carl-Zeiss-Strasse 22 73446 Oberkochen / DE | ||
Former [2010/50] | For:DE
FR
Carl Zeiss AG Carl-Zeiss-Strasse 22 73446 Oberkochen / DE | ||
For:GB
Carl-Zeiss-Stiftung trading as Carl Zeiss 89518 Heidenheim (Brenz) / DE | |||
Former [2004/31] | For:DE
FR
Carl Zeiss 89518 Heidenheim (Brenz) / DE | ||
For:GB
Carl-Zeiss-Stiftung trading as Carl Zeiss 89518 Heidenheim (Brenz) / DE | |||
Former [2002/35] | For:DE
FR
Carl Zeiss 89518 Heidenheim (Brenz) / DE | ||
For:GB
Carl-Zeiss-Stiftung, trading as Carl Zeiss 89518 Heidenheim (Brenz) / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cappellaro, Markus Dominikstrasse 25 81929 München / DE | [2002/35] | Application number, filing date | 01128671.3 | 01.12.2001 | [2002/35] | Priority number, date | DE20011009130 | 24.02.2001 Original published format: DE 10109130 | [2002/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1235424 | Date: | 28.08.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1235424 | Date: | 02.09.2009 | [2009/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H04N3/15, G02B21/36 | [2002/35] | CPC: |
G02B21/367 (EP,US);
G06T3/40 (EP,US);
H01L27/14603 (EP,US);
H04N25/48 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2010/18] |
Former [2002/35] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Aufzeichnung und Darstellung von Fluoreszenzbildern mit hoher räumlicher Auflösung | [2002/35] | English: | Method for recording and displaying fluorescence images with high resolution | [2002/35] | French: | Méthode d'enregistrement et d'affichage des images fluorescentes à haute résolution | [2002/35] | Examination procedure | 25.11.2009 | Examination requested [2010/01] | 12.01.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.04.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/36] | 23.04.2018 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 22.05.2018 | 22.05.2018 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.01.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 23.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 19.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 22.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 22.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 23.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 21.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 17 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]EP0199573 (DU PONT [US]); | [A]EP0510329 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO [JP]); | [A]DE4230724 (LEICA MIKROSKOPIE & SYST [DE]); | [A]WO0059206 (UNIV RAMOT [IL], et al); | Examination | DE3837063 |