EP1213530 - Compact gas removal system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.10.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.11.2009 [2009/48] | Applicant(s) | For:DE
GB
Air Liquide Deutschland GmbH Hans-Günther-Sohl-Strasse 5 40235 Düsseldorf / DE | For:AT
BE
CH
CY
DK
ES
FI
FR
GR
IE
IT
LI
LU
MC
NL
PT
SE
TR
Messer Group GmbH Otto-Volger-Strasse 3c 65843 Sulzbach / DE | [2006/29] |
Former [2006/12] | For:DE
GB
Air Liquide Deutschland GmbH Hans-Günther-Sohl-Strasse 5 40235 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
For:AT
BE
CH
CY
DK
ES
FI
FR
GR
IE
IT
LU
MC
NL
PT
SE
TR
Messer Group GmbH Otto-Volger-Strasse 3c 65843 Sulzbach / DE | |||
Former [2006/11] | For all designated states Messer Group GmbH Otto-Volger-Strasse 3c 65843 Sulzbach / DE | ||
Former [2005/25] | For all designated states Air Liquide Deutschland GmbH Hans-Günther-Sohl-Strasse 5 40235 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2005/10] | For all designated states Air Liquide Deutschland GmbH Fütingsweg 34 47805 Krefeld / DE | ||
Former [2005/09] | For all designated states Air Liquide Deutschland GmbH Fütingsweg 34 47805 Krefeld / DE | ||
Former [2002/24] | For all designated states MESSER GRIESHEIM GmbH Fritz-Klatte-Strasse 6 65933 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pongraz, Johann Im alten Bruch 12 a 47259 Duisburg / DE | [2002/24] | Representative(s) | Kahlhöfer, Hermann, et al KNH Patentanwälte Kahlhöfer Neumann Rössler Heine PartG mbB Postfach 10 33 63 40024 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/49] | Kahlhöfer, Hermann, et al Patentanwälte Kahlhöfer Neumann Herzog Fiesser Postfach 10 33 63 40024 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 01128687.9 | 01.12.2001 | [2002/24] | Priority number, date | DE2000160726 | 07.12.2000 Original published format: DE 10060726 | [2002/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1213530 | Date: | 12.06.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1213530 | Date: | 02.01.2008 | [2008/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.12.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F17C13/04 | [2002/24] | CPC: |
F17C13/04 (EP);
F17C13/025 (EP);
F17C7/00 (EP);
F17C2221/012 (EP);
F17C2270/0184 (EP);
Y02E60/32 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/24] | Title | German: | Kompaktgasentnahmesystem | [2002/24] | English: | Compact gas removal system | [2002/24] | French: | Système compact de vidage de gaz | [2002/24] | Examination procedure | 21.05.2008 | Examination requested [2008/27] | 11.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 22.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.01.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.06.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/48] | 07.07.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2009/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0303735 (CLESSE MANDET SA [FR]) [X] 1-12 * figure 1; claim 1 *; | [X]EP0321007 (FIEGE LPG SERVICE [NL]) [X] 1-12 * figure 1 ** column 2, lines 30-54 *; | [X]WO9630817 (FISHER CONTROLS INT [US]) [X] 1-12 * page 4, line 20 - page 5, line 26; figure 1 *; | [X]US5755254 (CARTER STEPHEN A [CA], et al) [X] 1-12 * column 1, lines 12-35 * * column 2, line 1 * * column 7, line 60 - column 8, line 20 *; | [X]US5863023 (EVANS BRYCE [US], et al) [X] 1-12 * column 4, line 8 - column 5, line 38 * * figure 1 * | by applicant | EP0303735 | WO9630817 | FR2735209 | US5755254 | US5863023 |