EP1221355 - Burnishing machine for crankshafts [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.03.2005 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.03.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.04.2005 [2005/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hegenscheidt-MFD GmbH & Co. KG Bernhard-Schondorff-Platz 41812 Erkelenz / DE | [2002/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Heffe, Roland Forster Strasse 15 41352 Korschenbroich / DE | [2002/28] | Representative(s) | Cohausz & Florack Patent- & Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Bleichstrasse 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/28] | Cohausz & Florack Patentanwälte Kanzlerstrasse 8a 40472 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 01128791.9 | 04.12.2001 | [2002/28] | Priority number, date | DE2000160218 | 04.12.2000 Original published format: DE 10060218 | [2002/28] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1221355 | Date: | 10.07.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/28] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1221355 | Date: | 28.01.2004 | [2004/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B24B39/04, B24B49/16 | [2004/05] | CPC: |
B24B39/04 (EP,US);
Y10T29/17 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2002/28] | B24B39/04 | Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2004/43] |
Former [2002/28] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Festwalzmaschine für Kurbelwellen | [2002/28] | English: | Burnishing machine for crankshafts | [2002/28] | French: | Machine d'écrouissage pour vilbrequins | [2002/28] | Examination procedure | 29.07.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/17] | 22.11.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2005/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 03.09.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 03.09.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 03.09.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 03.09.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 03.09.2004 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 03.09.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 03.09.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 03.09.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 03.09.2004 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 03.09.2004 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 03.09.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 03.09.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 03.09.2004 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 03.09.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 03.09.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 03.09.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 03.09.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 03.09.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 03.09.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 03.09.2004 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2004 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE573094 (KRUPP AG) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [A]US4559798 (HAYASHI TAKEHIKO [JP], et al) [A] 1 * column 7, line 66 - column 8, line 65; figure 7 *; | [DA]EP0881041 (HEGENSCHEIDT MFD GMBH [DE]) [DA] 1 * column 3, line 49 - column 8, line 19 * * figure 2A * |