EP1221572 - Swirler burner [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.08.2006 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.08.2009 | Change - representative | published on 23.09.2009 [2009/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Haldor Topso̸e A/S Nymo̸llevej 55 2800 Kgs. Lyngby / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2002/28] | For all designated states Haldor Topsoe A/S Nymollevej 55 2800 Kgs. Lyngby / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Primdahl, Iver Ivarsen Dalmosevej 6-8 2800 Kgs. Lyngby / DK | [2002/28] | Representative(s) | Zellentin, Wiger Patentanwälte Zellentin & Partner Rubensstrasse 30 67061 Ludwigshafen / DE | [2009/39] |
Former [2005/33] | Zellentin, Wiger Patentanwälte Zellentin & Partner GbR Rubensstrasse 30 67061 Ludwigshafen / DE | Application number, filing date | 01128820.6 | 04.12.2001 | [2002/28] | Priority number, date | DK20010000010 | 04.01.2001 Original published format: DK 200100010 | [2002/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1221572 | Date: | 10.07.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/28] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1221572 | Date: | 31.07.2002 | [2002/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1221572 | Date: | 05.10.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.06.2002 | Classification | IPC: | F23D14/24, F23C7/00 | [2002/28] | CPC: |
F23D14/24 (EP,US);
F23C7/004 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/17] |
Former [2002/28] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Drallbrenner | [2002/28] | English: | Swirler burner | [2002/28] | French: | Brûleur à générateur de vortex | [2002/28] | Examination procedure | 31.01.2003 | Examination requested [2003/14] | 13.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.09.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.03.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.08.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 03.08.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.07.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 05.10.2005 | BE | 05.10.2005 | TR | 05.10.2005 | CY | 04.12.2005 | IE | 05.12.2005 | LU | 31.12.2005 | MC | 31.12.2005 | DK | 05.01.2006 | GR | 05.01.2006 | SE | 05.01.2006 | ES | 16.01.2006 | PT | 06.03.2006 | [2007/20] |
Former [2007/09] | AT | 05.10.2005 | |
BE | 05.10.2005 | ||
TR | 05.10.2005 | ||
IE | 05.12.2005 | ||
LU | 31.12.2005 | ||
MC | 31.12.2005 | ||
DK | 05.01.2006 | ||
GR | 05.01.2006 | ||
SE | 05.01.2006 | ||
ES | 16.01.2006 | ||
PT | 06.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/51] | AT | 05.10.2005 | |
BE | 05.10.2005 | ||
TR | 05.10.2005 | ||
IE | 05.12.2005 | ||
MC | 31.12.2005 | ||
DK | 05.01.2006 | ||
GR | 05.01.2006 | ||
SE | 05.01.2006 | ||
ES | 16.01.2006 | ||
PT | 06.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | AT | 05.10.2005 | |
BE | 05.10.2005 | ||
IE | 05.12.2005 | ||
MC | 31.12.2005 | ||
DK | 05.01.2006 | ||
GR | 05.01.2006 | ||
SE | 05.01.2006 | ||
ES | 16.01.2006 | ||
PT | 06.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/40] | AT | 05.10.2005 | |
BE | 05.10.2005 | ||
MC | 31.12.2005 | ||
DK | 05.01.2006 | ||
GR | 05.01.2006 | ||
SE | 05.01.2006 | ||
ES | 16.01.2006 | ||
PT | 06.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/38] | AT | 05.10.2005 | |
BE | 05.10.2005 | ||
DK | 05.01.2006 | ||
GR | 05.01.2006 | ||
SE | 05.01.2006 | ||
ES | 16.01.2006 | ||
PT | 06.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/36] | AT | 05.10.2005 | |
BE | 05.10.2005 | ||
DK | 05.01.2006 | ||
SE | 05.01.2006 | ||
ES | 16.01.2006 | ||
PT | 06.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/34] | AT | 05.10.2005 | |
DK | 05.01.2006 | ||
SE | 05.01.2006 | ||
ES | 16.01.2006 | ||
PT | 06.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/33] | SE | 05.01.2006 | |
ES | 16.01.2006 | ||
PT | 06.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/27] | SE | 05.01.2006 | |
PT | 06.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/25] | PT | 06.03.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0283422 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [A] 4 * column 2, line 46 - line 51; figures 2,3 * * column 2, line 59 - column 3, line 13 ** column 2, line 61 - line 63 *; | [Y]US5020329 (EKSTEDT EDWARD E [US], et al) [Y] 4 * figures 1,2 * * column 2, line 49 - column 3, line 7 *; | [DY]US5496170 (PRIMDAHL IVAR I [DK], et al) [DY] 2,3,5 * figure 1 * * column 2, line 23 - line 27 *; | [XY]US5816049 (JOSHI NARENDRA D [US]) [X] 1 * figures 1,2,6 * * column 4, line 6 - line 30 * * column 5, line 44 - line 62 * * column 6, line 33 - line 48 * [Y] 2-5 | by applicant | US5496170 |