EP1253059 - Railway vehicle operation-control system and a railway vehicle using the operation control system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.06.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.06.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.07.2007 [2007/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6 Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8010 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/32] | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6 Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8010 / JP | ||
Former [2002/44] | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6 Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 101-8010 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nagasu, Masahiro 1048-144, Inada Hitachinaka-shi, Ibaraki 312-0061 / JP | 02 /
Sato, Yutaka 1-20-102, Moriyama-cho 4-chome Hitachi-shi, Ibaraki 316-025 / JP | 03 /
Kimura, Shin 5-4-5, 15 Jyo, Toyooka Asahikawa-shi, Hokkaido 078-8245 / JP | 04 /
Nakata, Kiyoshi 626-4, Kuwata, Iwase-machi Nishiibaraki-gun, Ibaraki 309-1223 / JP | [2002/44] | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [2002/44] | Application number, filing date | 01129018.6 | 06.12.2001 | [2002/44] | Priority number, date | JP20010127924 | 25.04.2001 Original published format: JP 2001127924 | [2002/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1253059 | Date: | 30.10.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1253059 | Date: | 09.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.08.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B61L3/00, B60L15/38, B60T13/66, B61L15/00 | [2002/44] | CPC: |
B61L15/0036 (EP,US);
B61L27/00 (KR);
B60L15/38 (EP,US);
B60T13/665 (EP,US);
B60T17/228 (EP,US);
B61L15/0081 (EP,US);
B61L25/021 (EP,US);
B61L25/025 (EP,US);
B60L2200/26 (EP,US);
B60L2240/525 (EP,US);
B61L2205/04 (EP,US);
Y02T10/72 (EP,US);
Y02T90/16 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2003/30] |
Former [2002/44] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Betriebssteuerungsanlage eines Schienenfahrzeuges und Fahrzeug mit derartiger Anlage | [2002/44] | English: | Railway vehicle operation-control system and a railway vehicle using the operation control system | [2002/44] | French: | Système de commande du fonctionnement d'un véhicule ferroviaire et un véhicule utilisant ce système | [2002/44] | Examination procedure | 25.04.2003 | Examination requested [2003/26] | 24.01.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.05.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 31.05.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.05.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5293632 (NOVAKOVICH MICHAEL R [US], et al) [A] 1,4,6-9,12,15,16 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9914093 (NEW YORK AIR BRAKE CORP [US]) [A] 1-3,8-10,16 * page 17, line 1 - page 30, line 22; figures 5-10 *; | [A]EP0755840 (NS RAILBEDRIJVEN BV [NL]) [A] 1-3,8-10,16 * claim - * |