EP1318060 - Wheeled container [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.04.2010 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.03.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 06.04.2011 [2011/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tony Brändle AG Wil St. Gallerstrasse 74 9500 Wil / CH | [2003/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Röthenmund, Fredy Kirchweg 1 9613 Mühlrüti / CH | [2003/24] | Representative(s) | Hepp, Dieter, et al Hepp Wenger Ryffel AG Friedtalweg 5 9500 Wil / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2003/24] | Hepp, Dieter, et al Hepp, Wenger & Ryffel AG, Friedtalweg 5 9500 Wil / CH | Application number, filing date | 01129198.6 | 10.12.2001 | [2003/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1318060 | Date: | 11.06.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1318060 | Date: | 27.05.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.04.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B62B5/04 | [2003/24] | CPC: |
B62B5/04 (EP);
B60T1/065 (EP);
B62B2005/0471 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, IT, LI [2004/10] |
Former [2003/24] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Rollcontainer | [2003/24] | English: | Wheeled container | [2003/24] | French: | Conteneur roulant | [2003/24] | Examination procedure | 12.08.2003 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 18.08.2003 | Examination requested [2003/42] | 06.04.2004 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) BE, CY, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | 13.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.12.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.04.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 07.04.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.03.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 03.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 05.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 19.01.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.01.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 19.01.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 19.01.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 19.01.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 19.01.2004 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 19.01.2004 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 19.01.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 19.01.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.01.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 19.01.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 19.01.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 19.01.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 19.01.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.01.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 27.05.2009 | [2011/14] | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US3968974 (WETZEL NELSON) [X] 1,4,5 * column W * [Y] 2,3,6-14; | [YA]EP0593905 (WANZL ENTWICKLUNG GMBH [DE]) [Y] 3,6,8,9,11 * column 4, line 45 - column 4, line 51; figures 1-3 *[A] 4; | [Y]US5433464 (HLEBAKOS NICHOLE R [US]) [Y] 6,7,10 * column A; figures 1,2,7 *; | [YA]GB2349126 (CUTMORE COLIN PAUL [GB]) [Y] 2,3,7,9-14 * the whole document * [A] 4 |