EP1215507 - Radio-wave arrival-direction estimating apparatus and directional variable transceiver [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.11.2008 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.12.2009 | Change - representative | published on 20.01.2010 [2010/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/47] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2002/25] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kishigami, Takaaki 3-10-3-201 Ikuta, Tama-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 214-0038 / JP | 02 /
Fukagawa, Takashi 1-10-1-203, Gorikida, Asao-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 215-0025 / JP | 03 /
Yuda, Yasuaki 3-33-17-108, Sugao, Miyame-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 216-0015 / JP | 04 /
Hoshino, Masayuki 1-30-20-B102, Nobi, Yokosuka-shi Kanagawa 239-0841 / JP | [2002/25] | Representative(s) | Balsters, Robert, et al Novagraaf International S.A. Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2010/03] | Balsters, Robert, et al Novagraaf International S.A. Avenue du Pailly 25 1220 Les Avanchets-Genève / CH | ||
Former [2002/25] | Balsters, Robert, et al Novagraaf SA 25, Avenue du Pailly 1220 Les Avanchets - Geneva / CH | Application number, filing date | 01129227.3 | 10.12.2001 | [2002/25] | Priority number, date | JP20000377003 | 12.12.2000 Original published format: JP 2000377003 | [2002/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1215507 | Date: | 19.06.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1215507 | Date: | 28.08.2002 | [2002/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.07.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G01S3/74 | [2002/25] | CPC: |
G01S3/74 (EP,US);
G06F2218/22 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2003/21] |
Former [2002/25] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Funkempfangspeilantennengerät und Sender-Empfänger mit variabler Richtcharakteristik | [2002/25] | English: | Radio-wave arrival-direction estimating apparatus and directional variable transceiver | [2002/25] | French: | Dispositif d'antenne pour estimer la direction d'incidence d'un signal à fréquence radio et émetteur-récepteur avec directivité variable | [2002/25] | Examination procedure | 19.11.2002 | Examination requested [2003/03] | 15.04.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.08.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.06.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/52] | 05.08.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2008/52] | Divisional application(s) | EP03018610.0 / EP1398645 | EP03018611.8 / EP1387180 | EP03018612.6 / EP1387181 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2007 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5262789 (SILVERSTEIN SETH D [US]) [A] 1-48 * abstract *; | [A]US5299148 (GARDNER WILLIAM A [US], et al) [A] 1-48 * abstract *; | [A]EP0632286 (HUGHES AIRCRAFT CO [US]) [A] 1-48* abstract *; | [A]US5943013 (OHASHI YOSHIMASA [JP]) [A] 1-48 * abstract *; | [Y]WO9965160 (ITALTEL SPA [IT], et al) [Y] 1-48 * page 31 - page 37 *; | [A]EP0971485 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-48 * abstract *; | [A]US6091361 (DAVIS DENNIS W [US], et al) [A] 1-48 * abstract *; | [Y]EP1031846 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-48 * page 1; figures 15,16 *; | [Y] - KARIMI H R ET AL, "A novel and efficient solution to block-based joint-detection using approximate Cholesky factorization", IEEE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON PERSONAL, INDOOR AND MOBILE RADIO COMMUNICATIONS, XX, XX, (1998), vol. 3, pages 1340 - 1345, XP002112134 [Y] 1-48 * page 1341 - page 1344 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/PIMRC.1998.731413 | [A] - SCHMIDT R O, "MULTIPLE EMITTER LOCATION AND SIGNAL PARAMETER ESTIMATION", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON ANTENNAS AND PROPAGATION, IEEE INC. NEW YORK, US, (19860301), vol. AP-34, no. 3, ISSN 0018-926X, pages 276 - 280, XP000644956 [A] 1-48 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TAP.1986.1143830 |