EP1215830 - Multi-channel, multi-mode redundant optical local loop having a bus topology [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.05.2012 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.05.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.06.2012 [2012/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alcatel USA Sourcing, L.P. 1000 Coit Road, M/S Legl2 Plano Texas 75075 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/25] | For all designated states Alcatel USA Sourcing, L.P. 1000 Coit Road, M/S Legl2 Plano, Texas 75075 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Foltzer, Lawrence E. 4259 Deer Meadow Lane Occidential, CA 95465 / US | [2002/25] | Representative(s) | DREISS Patentanwälte PartG mbB Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Dreiss, Fuhlendorf, Steimle & Becker Patentanwälte Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2002/25] | Dreiss, Fuhlendorf, Steimle & Becker Patentanwälte Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 01129332.1 | 14.12.2001 | [2002/25] | Priority number, date | US20000738223 | 15.12.2000 Original published format: US 738223 | [2002/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1215830 | Date: | 19.06.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1215830 | Date: | 28.01.2004 | [2004/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04B10/08, H04B10/00 | [2004/05] | CPC: |
H04B10/032 (EP,US);
H04J14/02 (US);
H04B10/0793 (EP,US);
H04J14/028 (EP,US);
H04J14/0294 (EP,US);
H04J14/0295 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2002/25] | H04B10/08 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/43] |
Former [2002/25] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Mehrkanaliger multimoder redundanter optischer Teilnehmeranschluss mit Bustopologie | [2002/25] | English: | Multi-channel, multi-mode redundant optical local loop having a bus topology | [2002/25] | French: | Boucle locale optique redondante multicanale et multimode à topologie en bus | [2002/25] | Examination procedure | 27.07.2004 | Examination requested [2004/39] | 03.08.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.08.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.12.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/23] | 18.01.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/23] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.09.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 23.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5479082 (CALVANI RICCARDO [IT], et al); | [X]US5510917 (CORKE MICHAEL [US], et al); | [A]EP0720314 (AT & T CORP [US]); | [A]US5790286 (BAE TAE-KYUNG [KR]); | [Y]US5969836 (FOLTZER LAWRENCE EDWIN [US]); | [Y]US6041152 (CLARK TIMOTHY EDWARD [US]); | [XY]EP1041852 (NEC CORP [JP]) |