EP1184389 - Heterocyclic metal complexes and olefin polymerization process [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.12.2004 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.12.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.01.2005 [2005/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY 2030 Dow Center, Abbott Road Midland, Michigan 48640 / US | For all designated states THE UNIVERSITY OF MICHIGAN 3003 State Street Ann Arbor MI 48109-1274 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/10] | For all designated states THE DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY 2030 Dow Center, Abbott Road Midland, Michigan 48640 / US | ||
For all designated states THE UNIVERSITY OF MICHIGAN 3003 State Street Ann Arbor, MI 48109-1274 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Timmers, Francis J. 4605 Lund Drive Midland, MI 48642 / US | 02 /
Devore, David D. 4881 East Shaffer Road Midland, MI 48642 / US | 03 /
Ashe, Arthur J. III 722 Ulpand Hills Drive Chelsea, MI 48118 / US | 04 /
Al-Ahmad, Saleem A. 506 Lloyd Road Euclid, Ohio 44132 / US | 05 /
Fang, Xinggao 388 Woodsberry Shoals Drive Duncan, South Carolina 29334 / US | [2002/25] |
Former [2002/10] | 01 /
Timmers, Francis J. 4605 Lund Drive Midland, MI 48642 / US | ||
02 /
Devore, David D. 4881 East Shaffer Road Midland, MI 48642 / US | |||
03 /
Ashe, Arthur J. III 722 Ulpand Hills Drive Chelsea, MI 48118 / US | |||
04 /
Al-Ahmad, Saleem A. Apartment No. 2227A, 3171 International Drive Ypsilanti, MI 48197 / US | |||
05 /
Fang, Xinggao 2484 Arrowwood Ann Arbor, MI 48105 / US | Representative(s) | Burford, Anthony Frederick Beck Greener Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/10] | Burford, Anthony Frederick W.H. Beck, Greener & Co. 7 Stone Buildings Lincoln's Inn London WC2A 3SZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 01129409.7 | 26.03.1997 | [2002/10] | Priority number, date | US19960014278P | 27.03.1996 Original published format: US 14278 P | [2002/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1184389 | Date: | 06.03.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1184389 | Date: | 02.01.2004 | [2004/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C07F17/00, C08F10/00 | [2002/10] | CPC: |
C07F17/00 (EP);
C08F10/00 (EP);
C08F110/06 (EP);
C08F210/16 (EP);
C08F4/65912 (EP);
C08F4/65916 (EP);
C08F4/6592 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08F10/00, C08F4/659 (EP);
C08F110/06, C08F2500/15 (EP);
C08F210/16, C08F210/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, NL [2004/39] |
Former [2002/10] | BE, DE, FI, FR, GB, IT, NL | Title | German: | Heterocyclische Metallkomplexe und Olefinpolymerisationsverfahren | [2002/10] | English: | Heterocyclic metal complexes and olefin polymerization process | [2002/10] | French: | Complexes métalliques hétérocycliques et procédé de polymérisation d'oléfines | [2002/10] | Examination procedure | 10.12.2001 | Examination requested [2002/10] | 03.07.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/04] | 26.08.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/04] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP97919918.9 / EP0889897 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 05.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]US6034027 (KRISHNAMURTI RAMESH [US], et al) [E] 1 * col. 5 : compounds(I) and (II) * |