EP1225378 - Sealing arrangement [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.04.2007 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.08.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 05.09.2007 [2007/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Carl Freudenberg KG Höhnerweg 2-4 69469 Weinheim / DE | [2006/24] |
Former [2002/30] | For all designated states Carl Freudenberg KG Höhnerweg 2-4 69469 Weinheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Devouassoux, Serge Saint Vallier sur Marne 52200 Langres / FR | 02 /
Guillerme, Celine 10, rue Gambetta 52200 Langres / FR | 03 /
Kammerer, Eric 14, place de Verdun 52200 Langres / FR | [2002/30] | Application number, filing date | 01129669.6 | 13.12.2001 | [2002/30] | Priority number, date | DE2001102077 | 18.01.2001 Original published format: DE 10102077 | [2002/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1225378 | Date: | 24.07.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1225378 | Date: | 02.01.2004 | [2004/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1225378 | Date: | 14.06.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | F16J15/32 | [2002/30] | CPC: |
F16J15/3244 (EP);
F16J15/3228 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [2004/39] |
Former [2002/30] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Dichtungsanordnung | [2002/30] | English: | Sealing arrangement | [2002/30] | French: | Dispositif d'étanchéité | [2002/30] | Examination procedure | 20.11.2003 | Examination requested [2004/04] | 14.07.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.11.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.10.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.10.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 28.10.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.03.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | Opposition(s) | 15.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/21] | Request for further processing for: | 04.04.2006 | Request for further processing filed | 18.04.2006 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 09.05.2006 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 14.06.2006 | IT | 14.06.2006 | SE | 14.09.2006 | [2007/36] |
Former [2007/27] | GB | 14.06.2006 | |
SE | 14.09.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | SE | 14.09.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9429622 (NOK CORP [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4,7,8,10 * abstract *; | US6182975 [ ] (MATSUSHIMA NOBORU [JP], et al) [ ] * column 5, line 62 - column 6, line 5; figure 1B *; | [AD]DE19836986 (FREUDENBERG CARL FA [DE]) [AD] 1,5,7-10 * abstract * | by applicant | DE19836986 |