EP1217449 - Device for exposure of a peripheral area of a film circuit board [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 27.08.2004 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.2004 | Withdrawal of application | published on 13.10.2004 [2004/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states USHIODENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 6-1, Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0004 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/26] | For all designated states USHIODENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 6-1, Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-0004 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mimura, Yoshiki 2-4-12, Edaminami, Aoba-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 02 /
Tochihara, Kazumoto 4-36-2, Morinosato Atugi-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | [2002/26] | Representative(s) | Tomerius, Isabel, et al Lang & Tomerius Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Rosa-Bavarese-Strasse 5 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/33] | Tomerius, Isabel, Dr., et al Weber & Heim Patentanwälte Postfach 151324 80048 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/26] | Tomerius, Isabel, Dr. Dipl.-Chem., et al Patentanwälte Weber & Heim Bavariaring 29 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01129995.5 | 17.12.2001 | [2002/26] | Priority number, date | JP20000390314 | 22.12.2000 Original published format: JP 2000390314 | [2002/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1217449 | Date: | 26.06.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/26] | Classification | IPC: | G03F7/20 | [2002/26] | CPC: |
G03F7/2026 (EP,US);
G03F7/20 (KR);
G03F7/2028 (EP,US);
H05K1/0393 (EP,US);
H05K3/0082 (EP,US);
H05K3/0097 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/26] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Bestrahlungsvorrichtung für einen Randbereich einer Filmplatine | [2002/26] | English: | Device for exposure of a peripheral area of a film circuit board | [2002/26] | French: | Dispositif pour illuminer la pérephérie d'un circuit imprimé | [2002/26] | Examination procedure | 20.08.2004 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2004/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |