EP1217561 - Clearing center for electronic post dated financial instruments [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.09.2003 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.2009 | Change - representative | published on 30.09.2009 [2009/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Actrade Commerce Ltd. c/o Roberts & Co., 60 Nevis Street St. John's / AG | [2002/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Aharoni, Amos 2373 Broadway, Apt. 1721 New York, NY 10024 / US | [2002/26] | Representative(s) | Gervasi, Gemma, et al Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A. Viale Achille Papa, 30 20149 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2009/40] | Gervasi, Gemma, et al Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A. Corso di Porta Vittoria 9 20122 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2002/26] | Gervasi, Gemma, Dr. Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A., Corso di Porta Vittoria, 9 20122 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 01130042.3 | 18.12.2001 | [2002/26] | Priority number, date | US20000741386 | 20.12.2000 Original published format: US 741386 | [2002/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1217561 | Date: | 26.06.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1217561 | Date: | 17.07.2002 | [2002/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.05.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/60 | [2002/26] | CPC: |
G06Q20/04 (EP,US);
G06Q20/042 (EP,US);
G06Q20/24 (EP,US);
G06Q40/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | [2003/15] |
Former [2002/26] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verrechnungsstelle für elektronische nachdatierte Finanzinstrumente | [2002/26] | English: | Clearing center for electronic post dated financial instruments | [2002/26] | French: | Centre de virement pour des instruments financiers électroniques postdatés | [2002/26] | Examination procedure | 18.01.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/46] | 27.05.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2003/46] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 06.03.2003 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 06.03.2003 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.03.2003 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 06.03.2003 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 06.03.2003 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.03.2003 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 06.03.2003 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 06.03.2003 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 06.03.2003 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 06.03.2003 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 06.03.2003 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 06.03.2003 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.03.2003 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 06.03.2003 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 06.03.2003 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 06.03.2003 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 06.03.2003 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 06.03.2003 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.03.2003 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 06.03.2003 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No Search |