EP1321543 - Hydrolysis cell and its use in wind power generation system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.10.2004 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.10.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.11.2004 [2004/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALSTOM (Switzerland) Ltd Brown Boveri Strasse 7 5401 Baden / CH | [2003/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lacaze, Alain 3, rue des Champs 90850 Essert / FR | [2003/26] | Application number, filing date | 01130156.1 | 19.12.2001 | [2003/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1321543 | Date: | 25.06.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.05.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C25B1/04 | [2003/26] | CPC: |
C25B1/04 (EP);
Y02E60/36 (EP);
Y02P20/133 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2004/12] |
Former [2003/26] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Hydrolysezelle und deren Anwendung in windbetriebene Kraftanlage | [2003/26] | English: | Hydrolysis cell and its use in wind power generation system | [2003/26] | French: | Cellule d'hydrolyse et son utilisation dans une centrale éolienne | [2003/26] | Examination procedure | 26.02.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/47] | 15.06.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2004/47] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 04.02.2004 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 04.02.2004 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2003 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | CS254012 [ ] (CHMURNY MIROSLAV [CS]); | [A]GB2195659 (BRIGGS JOHN) [A] 1,2,7,11 * see whole document *; | [A]GB2066293 (NELSON H P A) [A] 1 * column 6 - column 7; claims 1-6 * | [X] - CHMURNY, MIROSLAV, "Equipment for molecular decomposition of water, aqueous mixtures, and solutions", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 110:239234 CA, URL: STN, XP002198702 [X] 1-4,6,7,10 * abstract * |