EP1217277 - Installation channel [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.08.2005 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states gabo Systemtechnik GmbH Am Schaidweg 7 94559 Niederwinkling / DE | [2002/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schaarschmidt, Dieter H. Raiffeisenstrasse 62 85716 Unterschleissheim / DE | 02 /
Loibl, Christian Ludmillastr. 16 94327 Bogen / DE | [2002/40] |
Former [2002/26] | 01 /
Schaarschmidt, Dieter H. Raiffeisenstrasse 62 85716 Unterschleissheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 01130157.9 | 19.12.2001 | [2002/26] | Priority number, date | DE2000165166 | 23.12.2000 Original published format: DE 10065166 | [2002/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1217277 | Date: | 26.06.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/26] | Type: | A8 Corrected patent application | No.: | EP1217277 | Date: | 04.12.2002 | [2002/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1217277 | Date: | 13.10.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.04.2002 | Classification | IPC: | F16L3/26, H02G3/04 | [2002/26] | CPC: |
H02G3/0425 (EP);
F16L3/26 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/26] | Extension states | LT | 26.06.2002 | LV | 26.06.2002 | RO | 26.06.2002 | SI | 26.06.2002 | Title | German: | Installationskanal | [2002/26] | English: | Installation channel | [2002/26] | French: | Canal d'installation | [2002/26] | Examination procedure | 23.05.2002 | Examination requested [2002/30] | 28.04.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.06.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 02.06.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.07.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2003 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   18.02.2004 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 13.10.2004 | ES | 13.10.2004 | FI | 13.10.2004 | FR | 13.10.2004 | GB | 13.10.2004 | IE | 13.10.2004 | IT | 13.10.2004 | NL | 13.10.2004 | SE | 13.10.2004 | TR | 13.10.2004 | AT | 19.12.2004 | LU | 19.12.2004 | BE | 31.12.2004 | MC | 31.12.2004 | DK | 13.01.2005 | GR | 13.01.2005 | PT | 13.03.2005 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/36] | CY | 13.10.2004 | |
ES | 13.10.2004 | ||
FI | 13.10.2004 | ||
FR | 13.10.2004 | ||
GB | 13.10.2004 | ||
IE | 13.10.2004 | ||
IT | 13.10.2004 | ||
NL | 13.10.2004 | ||
SE | 13.10.2004 | ||
TR | 13.10.2004 | ||
AT | 19.12.2004 | ||
LU | 19.12.2004 | ||
BE | 31.12.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
DK | 13.01.2005 | ||
GR | 13.01.2005 | ||
Former [2007/13] | CY | 13.10.2004 | |
ES | 13.10.2004 | ||
FI | 13.10.2004 | ||
FR | 13.10.2004 | ||
GB | 13.10.2004 | ||
IE | 13.10.2004 | ||
NL | 13.10.2004 | ||
SE | 13.10.2004 | ||
TR | 13.10.2004 | ||
AT | 19.12.2004 | ||
LU | 19.12.2004 | ||
BE | 31.12.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
DK | 13.01.2005 | ||
GR | 13.01.2005 | ||
Former [2007/09] | CY | 13.10.2004 | |
ES | 13.10.2004 | ||
FI | 13.10.2004 | ||
FR | 13.10.2004 | ||
GB | 13.10.2004 | ||
IE | 13.10.2004 | ||
NL | 13.10.2004 | ||
TR | 13.10.2004 | ||
AT | 19.12.2004 | ||
LU | 19.12.2004 | ||
BE | 31.12.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
DK | 13.01.2005 | ||
GR | 13.01.2005 | ||
SE | 13.01.2005 | ||
Former [2006/51] | FI | 13.10.2004 | |
FR | 13.10.2004 | ||
GB | 13.10.2004 | ||
IE | 13.10.2004 | ||
NL | 13.10.2004 | ||
TR | 13.10.2004 | ||
AT | 19.12.2004 | ||
BE | 31.12.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
DK | 13.01.2005 | ||
GR | 13.01.2005 | ||
Former [2006/34] | FI | 13.10.2004 | |
FR | 13.10.2004 | ||
GB | 13.10.2004 | ||
IE | 13.10.2004 | ||
NL | 13.10.2004 | ||
AT | 19.12.2004 | ||
BE | 31.12.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
DK | 13.01.2005 | ||
GR | 13.01.2005 | ||
Former [2006/32] | FI | 13.10.2004 | |
FR | 13.10.2004 | ||
GB | 13.10.2004 | ||
IE | 13.10.2004 | ||
NL | 13.10.2004 | ||
BE | 31.12.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
DK | 13.01.2005 | ||
GR | 13.01.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | FI | 13.10.2004 | |
GB | 13.10.2004 | ||
IE | 13.10.2004 | ||
NL | 13.10.2004 | ||
BE | 31.12.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
DK | 13.01.2005 | ||
GR | 13.01.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | FI | 13.10.2004 | |
GB | 13.10.2004 | ||
IE | 13.10.2004 | ||
NL | 13.10.2004 | ||
BE | 31.12.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
DK | 13.01.2005 | ||
GR | 13.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/51] | FI | 13.10.2004 | |
IE | 13.10.2004 | ||
BE | 31.12.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
DK | 13.01.2005 | ||
GR | 13.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | FI | 13.10.2004 | |
IE | 13.10.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
DK | 13.01.2005 | ||
GR | 13.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/45] | FI | 13.10.2004 | |
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
GR | 13.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/26] | FI | 13.10.2004 | |
GR | 13.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/24] | FI | 13.10.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0007203 (BRITISH INSULATED CALLENDERS [GB]) [A] 1-6 * claims 1-3 *; | [A]EP0277344 (REHAU AG & CO) [A] 1,4,7,8 * abstract * * column 2, line 48 - column 3, line 8 * * column 3, line 53 - column 4, line 5 * * column 4, line 47 - line 54 * * figure 1 *; | [A]WO9729623 (3COM IRELAND [GB], et al) [A] 1* claims 1-4 *; | [XA]CH690392 (MAYE JEAN [CH]) [X] 1-4,6 * abstract * * column 1, line 38 - line 46 * * column 2, line 31 - line 65 * * column 3, line 15 - line 40 * * column 4, line 40 - line 63 * * column 5, line 11 - line 25 * * claims 1-4,6 * * figures 1,2 * [A] 5,7-9 | Examination | DE9311700U |