EP1241807 - Heterodyne optical spectrum analyzer with provisions for intensity noise subtraction [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.08.2007 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.08.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.09.2007 [2007/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Agilent Technologies, Inc. - a Delaware Corporation - 5301 Stevens Creek Boulevard Santa Clara CA 95051 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2007/04] | For all designated states Agilent Technologies, Inc. - a Delaware Corporation - 5301 Stevens Creek Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95051 / US | ||
Former [2002/38] | For all designated states Agilent Technologies, Inc. (a Delaware corporation) 395 Page Mill Road Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Baney, Douglas M. 897 Clinton Rd. Los Altos, California 94024 / US | 02 /
Szafraniec, Bogdan 1035 Castleton Terrace D Sunnyvale, California 94087 / US | [2002/38] | Representative(s) | Liesegang, Eva, et al Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/38] | Liesegang, Eva, et al Forrester & Boehmert, Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01130312.0 | 19.12.2001 | [2002/38] | Priority number, date | US20010811220 | 17.03.2001 Original published format: US 811220 | [2002/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1241807 | Date: | 18.09.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1241807 | Date: | 11.08.2004 | [2004/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.06.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H04B10/148, H04B10/08, G01R23/17 | [2004/33] | CPC: |
H04B10/07 (EP,US);
H04B10/60 (EP,US);
H04B10/64 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2002/38] | H04B10/148, H04B10/08 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/18] |
Former [2002/38] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Heterodyner optischer Spektralanalysator mit Einrichtung zur Intensitätsrauschverminderung | [2002/38] | English: | Heterodyne optical spectrum analyzer with provisions for intensity noise subtraction | [2002/38] | French: | Analyseur de spectre hétérodyne optique avec dispositions pour soustraire le bruit d'intensité | [2002/38] | Examination procedure | 12.01.2005 | Examination requested [2005/11] | 30.10.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.03.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/36] | 17.04.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2007/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - YOSHIDA S ET AL, "High resolution optical spectrum analysis by coherent detection with multi-electrode DBR-LD's as local oscillators", INSTRUMENTATION AND MEASUREMENT TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE, 1994. IMTC/94. CONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS. 10TH ANNIVERSARY. ADVANCED TECHNOLOGIES IN I & M., 1994 IEEE HAMAMATSU, JAPAN 10-12 MAY 1994, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, (19940510), ISBN 0-7803-1880-3, pages 230 - 233, XP010122102 [A] 1-10 * page 230, column R; figure 1A * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/IMTC.1994.352070 | [A] - KATAOKA T ET AL, "High resolution optical spectrum analyzer using a heterodyne detection technique", INSTRUMENTATION AND MEASUREMENT TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE, 1994. IMTC/94. CONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS. 10TH ANNIVERSARY. ADVANCED TECHNOLOGIES IN I & M., 1994 IEEE HAMAMATSU, JAPAN 10-12 MAY 1994, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, (19940510), ISBN 0-7803-1880-3, pages 234 - 237, XP010121721 [A] 1-10 * page 234, column R; figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/IMTC.1994.352084 |