EP1219588 - Production process for hydroxyalkyl (meth)acrylate [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.09.2007 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.09.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.10.2007 [2007/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIPPON SHOKUBAI CO., LTD. 1-1, Koraibashi 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0043 / JP | [2006/44] |
Former [2002/27] | For all designated states Nippon Shokubai Co., Ltd. 1-1, Koraibashi 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0043 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Uemura, Masahiro 25-13, Aoyama 1-chome Himeji-shi, Hyogo 671-2222 / JP | 02 /
Ishida, Tokumasa Otsu-Apartment 69-19, 29, Otsu-cho 3-chome Otsu-ku, Himeji-shi, Hyogo 671-1146 / JP | 03 /
Yoneda, Yukihiro 1971-1-406, Mega, Shikama-ku Himeji-shi, Hyogo 6721-8031 / JP | 04 /
Kajihara, Tetsuya 931-11, Hamada, Aboshi-ku Himeji-shi, Hyogo 671-1242 / JP | 05 /
Shingai, Yasuhiro 465-508, Tamate 2-chome Himeji-shi, Hyogo 670-0985 / JP | 06 /
Kawashima, Tadayoshi 931-11-E-303, Hamada, Aboshi-ku Himeji-shi, Hyogo 671-1242 / JP | [2002/27] | Representative(s) | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/27] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01130339.3 | 19.12.2001 | [2002/27] | Priority number, date | JP20000395770 | 26.12.2000 Original published format: JP 2000395770 | [2002/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1219588 | Date: | 03.07.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1219588 | Date: | 08.10.2003 | [2003/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1219588 | Date: | 02.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.08.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C07C67/26, C07C69/54 | [2002/27] | CPC: |
C07C67/26 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C07C67/26, C07C69/54 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, GB [2004/27] |
Former [2002/27] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Hydroxyalkyl(meth)acrylaten | [2002/27] | English: | Production process for hydroxyalkyl (meth)acrylate | [2002/27] | French: | Procédé de fabrication du (méth)acrylate d'hydroxyalkyle | [2002/27] | Examination procedure | 18.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/21] | 12.07.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.10.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.05.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.09.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 19.09.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.08.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5001102 (WELLS JAMES E [US]) [A] 1-5 * column 5, lines 5-45; examples 4-8 *; | [A]DD152540 (FISCHER WOLFGANG, et al) [A] 1-5 * page 4, paragraph 2 - page 8 * |